EP2164350 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING BACTERIA AND LECITHIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARBOLINO, Chiara Unilever R&D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
SANDERS, Jan Willem Unilever R&D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2010/12] | Corsten, Michael Allan Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 08774159.1 | 20.06.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008EP57831 | Priority number, date | EP20070112451 | 13.07.2007 Original published format: EP 07112451 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009010368 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2164350 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A23D7/00, A23L1/03, A23C9/123, A23J7/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A23D7/013 (EP,US);
A23C9/1234 (EP,US);
A23C9/1315 (EP,US);
A23D7/0056 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2400/173 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/15, A23V2200/3204, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/206, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/71, A23V2400/173 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1842, A23V2200/3204, A23V2250/206, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/71, A23V2200/15, A23V2250/211 (US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT BAKTERIEN UND LECITHIN | [2010/12] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING BACTERIA AND LECITHIN | [2010/12] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES BACTÉRIES ET DE LA LÉCITHINE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191319344 (SCHOU EINAR VIGGO [DK]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, lines 5-34; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO8404675 (HANSENS CHR BIO SYSTEMS AS [DK]) [A] 1-13* example 4; claims 1,20,28 *; | [DX]US4713341 (BILY ROBERT R [US]) [DX] 1-12 * column 1, lines 36-48; examples 1-8; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0339750 (ALTON SPILLER INC [US]) [DA] 1-8,10,11 * examples 1-3; claims 1,6,10,16 * * page 2, lines 10-19 * * page 6, lines 20-41 * * page 7, lines 28-34 * * page 8, lines 31-45 *; | [X]DE4220509 (WILKE RUEDIGER [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-11 * page 2, line 68; example 1; claims 1,2,6,11 *; | [DX]WO0132038 (HUNZA DI MARIA CARMELA MARAZZI [IT], et al) [DX] 1-12 * example 5; claims 1,7 * * page 4, lines 20-30 *; | [DX]JP2003334065 (NISSEI BIO KK) [DX] 1-12 * example 1; claims 1,2,8 *; | [DX]US2007160589 (MATTSON PETER H [US]) [DX] 1-12 * examples 1-3; claims 1,17 * * page 2, column L, paragraph 13 - page 3, column R, paragraph 25 *; | [PX]EP1932432 (FRIESLAND BRANDS BV [NL]) [PX] 1-12 * page 4, column 6, paragraph 27; examples 2,3; claims 1,2,5 *; | [DA] - DONTHIDI A R ET AL, "Effect of lecithin on viability and stability of probiotics", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, & BRITISH PHARMACEUTICAL CONFERENCE; MANCHESTER, UK; SEPTEMBER 04 -06, 2006, (2006), vol. 58, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0022-3573, page A34, XP008089455 [DA] 1-5,8,10 * the whole document * | [X] - STEFAN A ET AL, "Water in oil macroemulsions sustain lon term viability of microbial cells in organic solvents", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20030101), vol. 81, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 323 - 328, XP002428601 [X] 1,4-8,10,11 * page 324, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 325, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10476 |