EP2162269 - Expandable granulates from acrylonitrile copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/11] | MOULDED FOAMS MADE OF EXPANDABLE ACRYLONITRILE COPOLYMERS | ||
[2012/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIPS, Carsten Am Rosssprung 17 67342 Speyer / DE | 02 /
HAHN, Klaus Im Bügen 9 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 03 /
BELLIN, Ingo B2, 5 68159 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
LONGO, Daniela Bonner Str. 47 53721 Siegburg / DE | 05 /
ASSMANN, Jens Hugo-Wolf-Str. 6 68165 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
GIETL, Andreas Kleinfeldstr. 20 68165 Mannheim / DE | 07 /
GASSAN, Jochen Sauerbruchstr. 28 76829 Landau / DE | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/13] |
Former [2010/11] | Rippel, Hans Christoph Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08774315.9 | 26.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008EP58128 | Priority number, date | EP20070111306 | 28.06.2007 Original published format: EP 07111306 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009000872 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2162269 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162269 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/34, C08J9/00, C08J9/16, C08J9/232 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C08J9/232 (EP,US);
C08J9/16 (KR);
B29C44/3446 (KR);
B29C44/3461 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C08J2300/22 (KR);
C08J2325/06 (KR);
C08J2325/12 (KR);
C08J2325/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | B29C44/34, C08J9/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | Expandierbare Polymergranulate aus Acrylnitrilcopolymeren | [2012/02] | English: | Expandable granulates from acrylonitrile copolymers | [2012/02] | French: | Granules expansibles à base de copolymères d'acrylonitrile | [2012/02] |
Former [2010/11] | PARTIKELSCHAUMFORMTEILE AUS EXPANDIERBAREN ACRYLNITRILCOPOLYMEREN | ||
Former [2010/11] | MOULDED FOAMS MADE OF EXPANDABLE ACRYLONITRILE COPOLYMERS | ||
Former [2010/11] | MOULAGE EN MOUSSE DE PARTICULES DE COPOLYMÈRES D'ACRYLONITRILE EXPANSIBLES | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2008 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MC | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | NO | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/13] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 15.08.2012 | |
NO | 15.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001181433 ; | [X]JPS6063235 ; | [X]GB994074 (KOPPERS CO INC) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 12 - page 3, line 121; figure .; claim - *; | [X]US3288731 (INGRAM ALVIN R, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 73; examples II,III,XIV *; | [X]US3639302 (BROWN JOSEPH PATRICK, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 2; example II * * column 4, line 71 - column 6, line 75 *; | [X]EP0128335 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-14 * column 1, lines 1-7 * * column 3, line 3 - column 7, line 35; example -; claim - *; | [X]DE3711028 (MITSUBISHI YUKA BADISCHE [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 57; claim - *; | [X]WO0043442 (SUNPOR KUNSTSTOFF GES MBH [AT], et al) [X] 1-15* page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 33; claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 66, Database accession no. 2001-586351, XP002491535 & JP2001181433 A 20010703 (KANEKA CORP) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0020]; example - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 21, Database accession no. 1985-125323, XP002491536 & JPS6063235 A 19850411 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM KK) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |