EP2181270 - MOUNTING ARRANGEMENT FOR A HINGE BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUEDTKE, Ulrich Goellnitzer Str. 7 76227 Karlsruhe-Durlach / DE | 02 /
SUAREZ-SEMINARIO, Dariusz Kapellenstr. 11 76547 Sinzheim / DE | 03 /
SCHMID-SCHOENBEIN, Christian Sophienstr. 165 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/11] | Application number, filing date | 08774322.5 | 26.06.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008EP58138 | Priority number, date | DE20071039238 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007039238 | [2010/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009024377 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2181270 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181270 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
F16C23/04 (EP);
F16C11/0614 (EP);
F16C27/02 (EP);
F16C33/08 (EP);
F16C35/02 (EP);
H02K5/1672 (EP);
H02K7/083 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | F16C23/04, F16C33/08, H02K5/167 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN GELENKLAGER | [2010/18] | English: | MOUNTING ARRANGEMENT FOR A HINGE BEARING | [2010/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE FIXATION POUR UN PALIER D'ARTICULATION | [2012/02] |
Former [2010/18] | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION POUR UN PALIER D'ARTICULATION | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2008 | CY | 14.03.2012 | CZ | 14.03.2012 | DK | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | HR | 14.03.2012 | IT | 14.03.2012 | LT | 14.03.2012 | LV | 14.03.2012 | MT | 14.03.2012 | NL | 14.03.2012 | PL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SE | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | NO | 14.06.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | ES | 25.06.2012 | GB | 26.06.2012 | IE | 26.06.2012 | LU | 26.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | IS | 14.07.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
LU | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
GB | 26.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 14.03.2012 | |
NO | 14.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3701574 (PHILLIPS BENJAMIN) [X] 1-6,17 * figures 1,2,4,6 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 36 *; | [X]US3770990 (WINKELMANN H) [X] 1-6 * column 1, lines 1-7; figures 2-5 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 24 *; | [XA]DE2416878 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-6,17 * pages 1-4 * * claims 1-5 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 8,9,11-13,16; | [X]FR2639161 (VALEO [FR]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-13,16,17 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, lines 18-25 * * page 4, lines 3-5,17-25 * * page 5, lines 21-27 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0592303 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [X] 1-6,17 * figures 1-6 * * column 3, lines 15-53 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 19 *; | [XA]WO9720376 (ITT AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRICAL SYST [US]) [X] 1-3,17 * page 4, columns 16-26 * * page 5, columns 1-22 * * figures 1,4,5 *[A] 8,9,11-13,16; | [X]EP0821170 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-7,17 * pages 1,2 * * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 27 *; | [X]DE102005030871 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11-13,17 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0027] - [0029] * * figures 1a,2,3 *; | [X]EP1744436 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,17 * the whole document * |