EP2175767 - A DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYRAKTAR, Songul E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla, 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
CETINKAYA, Ebru E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla, 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2010/16] | Application number, filing date | 08774617.8 | 02.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP58476 | Priority number, date | TR20070004575 | 02.07.2007 Original published format: TR 200704575 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004019 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175767 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175767 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, A47L15/46 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
A47L15/4229 (EP);
A47L2401/11 (EP);
A47L2401/22 (EP);
A47L2401/34 (EP);
A47L2501/26 (EP);
A47L2501/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE | [2010/16] | English: | A DISHWASHER | [2010/16] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 01.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HR | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | NO | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | IE | 02.07.2011 | LU | 02.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/26] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.07.2011 | ||
LU | 02.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.07.2011 | ||
LU | 02.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | BE | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
HR | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
NO | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0130229 (ELTEK SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 34, line 1 - line 9 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 7 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 2 *; | [A]DE10027844 (AWECO APPLIANCE SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 34 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 8 *; | [PA]WO2007074088 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [PA] 1-5 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0021] * |