EP2171061 - PREPARATION OF AN ESTERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DPx Holdings B.V. Kabelweg 37 1014 BA Amsterdam / NL | [2014/49] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIETZMANN, Martin Maiffredygasse 12/13 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
SCHWAB, Helmut Mariagruenerstrasse 91 A-8043 Graz / AT | 03 /
PICHLER, Harald Holleneggerstrasse 42 A-8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT | 04 /
IVANCIC, Mirela Purgarija 18 10431 Sv. Nedjelja / HR | 05 /
MAY, Oliver Eberburgweg 47 B 52076 Aachen / DE | 06 /
LUITEN, Rudolf, Gijsbertus, Marie Akkerhoornbloem 26 NL-2317 KR Leiden / NL | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Van den Berg, Frans Richard DPx Fine Chemicals Austria GmbH KG IP-Department P.O. Box 933 4021 Linz / AT | [2017/39] |
Former [2010/14] | Hoogendam, Gerrie Christine DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 08774807.5 | 04.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008EP58731 | Priority number, date | EP20070013092 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: EP 07013092 | EP20080000828 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: EP 08000828 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009004093 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171061 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2171061 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N15/67, C12N9/18, C12N1/21, C12N15/70 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
C12N9/18 (EP,US);
C12N15/70 (EP,US);
C12Y301/01001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER ESTERASE | [2010/14] | English: | PREPARATION OF AN ESTERASE | [2010/14] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'UNE ESTÉRASE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004055177 (DEGUSSA [DE]; BORNSCHEUER UWE T [DE]; MUSIDLOWSKA-PERSSON ANNA [SE]; T) [X] 8-10 * sequence - *; | [A]US2004161836 (BORNSCHEUR UWE [DE] ET AL BORNSCHEUER UWE [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * examples 2,3 *; | WO0248322 [ ] (DEGUSSA [DE]; BORNSCHEUER UWE [DE]; MUSIDLOWSKA ANNA [DE]; SCHMIDT-DAN); | [AD]US6872563 (BECKWITH JONATHAN [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2007073847 (DSM FINE CHEM AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]; STEINBAUER GERHARD [AT]; STANEK MICHA) [XP] 8-10 * sequence 1 * | [DX] - BOETTCHER DOMINIQUE ET AL, "Functional expression of the gamma-isoenzyme of pig liver carboxyl esterase in Escherichia coli", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20060908), vol. 73, no. 6, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 1282 - 1289, XP002456633 [DX] 1-10 * page 1284, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-006-0585-1 | [DA] - KAY TERPE, "Overview of bacterial expression systems for heterologous protein production: from molecular and biochemical fundamentals to commercial systems", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (20060622), vol. 72, no. 2, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 211 - 222, XP019422070 [DA] 1-10 * page 212; table 1 * * page 213, column L - column R; table 2b * * page 215, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-006-0465-8 | [DA] - S. LANGE ET AL, "Cloning, functional expression, and characterization of recombinant Pig liver Esterase.", CHEMBIOCEM, (2001), vol. 2, pages 576 - 582, XP002483884 [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1439-7633(20010803)2:7/8<576::AID-CBIC576>3.0.CO;2-Y | [A] - MATSUSHIMA M ET AL, "The nucleotide and deduced amino acid sequences of porcine liver proline- beta-naphthylamidase. Evidence for the identity with carboxylesterase", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19911118), vol. 293, no. 1-2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 37 - 41, XP002209303 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)81147-Z | [A] - R. NOVY ET AL, "Overcoming the codon bias of E. coli for enhanced protein expression", INNOVATIONS, (200106), vol. 12, pages 1 - 3, XP002483885 [A] 1-10 * table 2 * * page 3; table 3 * | [DA] - BESSETTE P H ET AL, "Efficient folding of proteins with multiple disulfide bonds in the Escherichia coli cytoplasm", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (19991123), vol. 96, no. 24, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13703 - 13708, XP002233564 [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.24.13703 | [A] - BRUESEHABER E ET AL, "Identification of pig liver esterase variants by tandem mass spectroscopy analysis and their characterization", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20070626), vol. 76, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 853 - 859, XP002456632 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-007-1061-2 | [A] - ASLUND F ET AL, "Efficient production of disulfide bonded proteins in the cytoplasm in oxidizing mutants of E. coli", INNOVATIONS, XX, XX, (19991101), vol. 10, pages 11 - 12, XP002456634 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |