EP2167626 - FORMULATIONS OF CARBOXYLIC ACID DIESTERS AND USE THEREOF FOR TREATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Opérations 40, Rue de La Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Rhodia Opérations 40 Rue de La Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANETTO, Jean-Emile 9 cité Charles Godon F-75009 Paris / FR | 02 /
NAIR, Suresh 38 Kingsdown road Cheam Sutton Surrey SM3 8NY / GB | 03 /
MUTOY, Serkan Sumer Mahallesi Denizati Kent Sitesi. A1 Blok No : 11/45 Zeytinburnu Istanbul / TR | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/13] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle C.R.T.L., BP62 85 rue des Frères Perret 69192 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 08775149.1 | 16.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008EP59329 | Priority number, date | FR20070056631 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0756631 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013208 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167626 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/72, C11D1/722, C11D3/20 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C09D9/04 (KR);
C11D1/66 (KR);
C11D1/722 (EP,US);
C11D17/00 (KR);
C11D3/2093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN VON CARBONSÄUREDIESTERN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MATERIALIEN | [2010/13] | English: | FORMULATIONS OF CARBOXYLIC ACID DIESTERS AND USE THEREOF FOR TREATING MATERIALS | [2010/13] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE DIESTERS D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MATERIAUX | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS56145998 ; | [DY]WO9601245 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [DY] 1-9,11,16-21 * page 3, lines 16-25; example 8; claim 19 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 5 * * page 15, lines 5-8 - page 17, lines 5-19 * [Y] 1-6,13-21; | [DY]EP0743358 (TEXTIL COLOR AG [CH]) [DY] 1-6,13-21 * page 6, lines 7-12,17-20,29-38; examples 1-8,17; claims 1-12,15,17,18 * * page 5, lines 53-56 *; | [A]FR2794476 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [A] 10-18* page 1, lines 26-29 - page 4, lines 25-27,36,37; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE102005056230 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0024] , [0025]; claims 1-3,5,6,17-21 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 52, Database accession no. 1981-95642D, XP002470385 & JPS56145998 A 19811113 (UBE IND LTD) [Y] 1-9,11,16-21 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9601245 | WO9630453 | EP0743358 |