EP2178850 - TRAZODONE AND TRAZODONE HYDROCHLORIDE IN PURIFIED FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aziende Chimiche Riunite Angelini Francesco A.C.R.A.F. S.p.A. Viale Amelia, 70 00181 Roma / IT | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCHETTI, Marcello Via Cesio Basso 32 I-00136 Rome / IT | 02 /
IACOANGELI, Tommaso Piazza di Villa Carpegna 43 I-00165 Roma / IT | 03 /
CIOTTOLI, Giovanni Battista Via Polia 28 I-00178 Roma / IT | 04 /
BIONDI, Giuseppe Viale Aldo Moro 22 I-00040 Castel Gandolfo (Roma) / IT | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Allaix, Roberto Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Allaix, Roberto Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/17] | Allaix, Roberto Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Pirelli, 19 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08775309.1 | 23.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008EP59640 | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01603 | 03.08.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071603 | US20070976535P | 01.10.2007 Original published format: US 976535 P | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009019133 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178850 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178850 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/18, A61K31/4196, A61P25/22, A61P25/24 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K47/06 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/18 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61K47/38 (US);
A61K47/44 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D249/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | TRAZODON UND TRAZODONHYDROCHLORID IN AUFGEREINIGTER FORM | [2010/17] | English: | TRAZODONE AND TRAZODONE HYDROCHLORIDE IN PURIFIED FORM | [2010/17] | French: | TRAZODONE ET CHLORHYDRATE DE TRAZODONE SOUS FORME PURIFIÉE | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Observations by third parties | 06.12.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2013 | 09.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US3381009 (PALAZZO GIUSEPPE, et al) [XD] 21-28 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XA]GB1117068 (ACRAF) [X] 21-28 * the whole document *[A] 1; | [XA]FR8135M (ACRAF) [X] 21-28 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XDA]EP1108722 (ACRAF [IT]) [XD] 21-28 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | US3381009 |