EP2169826 - CIRCUIT FOR RADIOFREQUENCY DEVICES APPLICABLE TO LIVING TISSUES AND DEVICE CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiba, S.A. C/ Enamorats 17-19 08013 Barcelona / ES | [2012/36] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Indiba, S.A. c/ Enamorats 17 08013 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARIO GARCÍA, Javier c/ Villarroel n 2, 6 4a E-08011 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
CALBET BENACH, José c/ Dr. August Pi i Sunyer n 7, 4 1a E-08034 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
BUISAN ESCARTIN, Jorge c/ Villar n 23, 2 3a 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Durán Moya, Carlos, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2012/36] |
Former [2010/13] | Durán Moya, Carlos, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 08037 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 08775400.8 | 26.05.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008ES00372 | Priority number, date | ES20070001702 | 20.06.2007 Original published format: ES 200701702 | [2012/36] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008155433 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169826 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169826 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 24.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03H1/00, H03H7/01 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (KR);
H03H1/00 (ES,KR);
A61B18/00 (KR);
H03H7/0115 (EP,US);
H03H7/175 (EP,US);
H03H7/1775 (EP,US);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2018/128 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1293 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | H03H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG FÜR HOCHFREQUENZEINRICHTUNGEN, DIE AUF LEBENDE GEWEBE ANWENDBAR SIND, UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE EINRICHTUNG | [2010/13] | English: | CIRCUIT FOR RADIOFREQUENCY DEVICES APPLICABLE TO LIVING TISSUES AND DEVICE CONTAINING SAME | [2010/13] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DISPOSITIFS DE RADIOFRÉQUENCE APPLICABLES SUR DES TISSUS VIVANTS ET DISPOSITIF LE CONTENANT | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2009 | Translation filed | 11.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 31.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2008 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | GR | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MC | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | IE | 26.05.2013 | LU | 26.05.2013 | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.05.2008 | |
AT | 05.09.2012 | ||
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.05.2013 | ||
LU | 26.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 26.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005083 (HANSELL CLARENCE W); | [A]NL7908680 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]US4571560 (DOBROVOLNY PIERRE [US]); | [A]DE3514676 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5907242 (GARD MICHAEL F [US]) | International search | [A]US5187457 (CHAWLA YOGENDRA K [US], et al); | [A]US2004008527 (HONDA JUN [US]); | [A]WO2006084505 (SCHAFFNER EMV AG [CH], et al) | by applicant | ES287964U | ES2139507 |