EP2176121 - MACHINERY ARRANGEMENT OF A MARINE VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Finland Oy Tarhaajantie 2 65380 Vaasa / FI | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENRIKSSON, Torbjörn Haastemiehenkatu 5 FI-20780 Kaarina / FI | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Finnilä, Kim Larseman, et al Berggren Oy Ab Antinkatu 3 C P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Finnilä, Kim Larseman, et al AWEK Industrial Patents Ltd Oy, P.O. Box 230 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08775464.4 | 09.06.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008FI50339 | Priority number, date | FI20070005569 | 13.08.2007 Original published format: FI 20075569 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009022050 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176121 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176121 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/14, B63J2/12, F23J15/00, F02G5/02, B01D47/02 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
B63H21/14 (EP,US);
F02G5/02 (FI);
B63J2/12 (FI);
B63J3/02 (EP,US);
F01N3/04 (EP,US);
F01N5/02 (EP,FI,US);
F23J15/08 (EP,FI,US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
F01N2590/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | MASCHINENANORDNUNG FÜR EIN SEEFAHRZEUG | [2010/16] | English: | MACHINERY ARRANGEMENT OF A MARINE VESSEL | [2010/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MACHINERIE D'UN VAISSEAU MARIN | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 24.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2008 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | IE | 09.06.2012 | LU | 09.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2353715 (SULZER AG [CH]) [Y] 1,6,7 * page 3, lines 10-13; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3334878 (HOELTER HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [YA]US6402816 (TRIVETT GORDON S [CA], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *[A] 1,3,5,7; | [YA]CA2464269 (DIVERSIFIED METAL ENGINEERING [CA]) [Y] 6 * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 10; figure 2 * [A] 1,3,7 | by applicant | DE3334878 |