EP2114126 - PRODUCTION OF HYBRID LACTUCA SATIVA SEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vilmorin Route du Manoir, La Garenne 49250 La Menitre / FR | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHEL, Hervé 14, rue Volney F-49000 Angers / FR | 02 /
SOUSSIN, Thierry La Haute Macrère F-49630 Maze / FR | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. c/o Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Almond-Martin, Carol, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08775629.2 | 05.03.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008FR00289 | Priority number, date | FR20070001589 | 05.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0701589 | [2009/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008132310 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114126 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/02, A01H5/10 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
A01H5/12 (EP,US);
A01H6/1472 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Extension states | AL | 18.08.2009 | BA | 18.08.2009 | MK | 18.08.2009 | RS | 18.08.2009 | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG HYBRIDER GARTENSALATSAMEN | [2009/46] | English: | PRODUCTION OF HYBRID LACTUCA SATIVA SEEDS | [2009/46] | French: | PRODUCTION DE GRAINES LACTUCA SATIVA HYBRIDES | [2009/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP12151241.2 / EP2476307 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005144672 (KNERR LARRY D [US]) [X] 1-4,7,12-15,17-20,22-28,30-42 * claims 1-28 *; | [X]US2006021077 (VAN SCHIJNDEL JOHANNES T [NL]) [X] 1-4,7,12-15,17-20,22-28,30-42 * claims 1-26 *; | [PX]WO2007146420 (PROGENY ADVANCED GENETICS [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,7,12-21* abstract *; | [XDY] - GOUBARA MASASHI ET AL, "Pollination effects of the sweat bee Lasioglossum villosulum trichopse (Hymenoptera: Halictidae) on genic male-sterile lettuce", APPLIED ENTOMOLOGY AND ZOOLOGY, (200402), vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0003-6862, pages 163 - 169, XP002453710 [XD] 1-4,7,12-15,17-20,22-28,30-42 * the whole document * [Y] 5,8-11,16,21,29,43,44,46,47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1303/aez.2004.163 | [XDY] - GOUBARA MASASHI ET AL, "Flower visitors of lettuce under field and enclosure conditions.", APPLIED ENTOMOLOGY AND ZOOLOGY, (200311), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0003-6862, pages 571 - 581, XP002453709 [XD] 1-4,7,12-15,17-20,22-28,30-42 * abstract * * page 571 * * page 579 - page 580 * [Y] 5,8-11,16,21,46,47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1303/aez.2003.571 | [XY] - REZNAERTS A ET AL, "ENGINEERED GENES FOR FERTILITY CONTROL AND THEIR APPLICATION IN HYBRID SEED PRODUCTION", SCIENTIA HORTICULTURAE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, XX, (19930101), vol. 55, ISSN 0304-4238, pages 125 - 139, XP002911358 [X] 1-4,7,12-15,17-20,22-28,30-42 * page 136 - page 138 * [Y] 5,8-11,16,21,46,47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4238(93)90028-O | [YD] - MAISONNEUVE B ET AL, "RAPID MAPPING OF TWO GENES FOR RESISTANCE TO DOWNY MILDEW FROM LACTUCA SERRIOLA TO EXISTING CLUSTERS OF RESISTANCE GENES", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (1994), vol. 89, no. 1, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 96 - 104, XP008053397 [YD] 8-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00226989 | [YD] - KUANG HANHUI ET AL, "Multiple genetic processes result in heterogeneous rates of evolution within the major cluster disease resistance genes in lettuce", PLANT CELL, (200411), vol. 16, no. 11, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 2870 - 2894, XP002453711 [YD] 8-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.104.025502 | [YD] - RYDER E J, "GENETIC STUDIES IN LETTUCE-D LACTUCA-SATIVA-D", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (1971), vol. 96, no. 6, ISSN 0003-1062, pages 826 - 828, XP008096284 [YD] 5,16,21,29,43,44 * page 828 * |