EP2168005 - FOCUS CONTROL APPARATUS, IMAGE SENSING APPARATUS, AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA, Hitoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2019/09] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
YASUDA, Hitoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 Square, Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [2019/09] |
Former [2010/13] | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 Square, Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 08778190.2 | 09.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008JP62773 | Priority number, date | JP20070181116 | 10.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007181116 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009008541 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2168005 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2168005 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03B13/36, H04N5/232 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
G03B13/36 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FOKUSSTEUERUNGSGERÄT, BILDERFASSUNGSGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/13] | English: | FOCUS CONTROL APPARATUS, IMAGE SENSING APPARATUS, AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2010/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE MISE AU POINT, APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE APPARENTÉ | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2008 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | GB | 09.07.2019 | IE | 09.07.2019 | LU | 09.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.07.2008 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
GB | 09.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
GB | 09.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
GB | 09.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
GB | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
GB | 09.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
GB | 09.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | CZ | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH02217075 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,4,5,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,10; | [A]US5003339 (KIKUCHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,9* column 6, line 41 - column 11, line 22 *; | [DA]JP2001215403 (CANON KK) [DA] 1,9 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004090551 (YATA KUNIO [JP]) [Y] 2,10 * abstract *; | [X]US2006072915 (ONOZAWA MASARU [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 5,6 *; | [Y]US2006182433 (KAWAHARA TAKUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0079] *; | [DA]JP2006227080 (NIKON CORP) [DA] 1,9 * abstract * |