EP2185795 - HYDRO-MECHANICAL VALVE ACTUATION SYSTEM FOR SPLIT-CYCLE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scuderi Group, LLC 1111 Elm Street Suite 4 West Springfield MA 01089 / US | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELDOLESI, Riccardo Flat 448 First Avenue Hove East Sussex BN3 2FF / GB | 02 /
LACY, Clive 57 Aldsworth Goring-by-Sea West Sussex BN12 4XG / GB | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Harding, Andrew Philip, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 08779990.4 | 01.07.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008US08302 | Priority number, date | US20070963742P | 07.08.2007 Original published format: US 963742 P | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009020504 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185795 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/02, F01L3/20, F01L1/46 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
F01L1/465 (EP,US);
F01L3/20 (EP,US);
F01L9/12 (EP,US);
F02B33/22 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34446 (EP,US);
F01L2003/258 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | F01L9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSSYSTEM EINES HYDROMECHANISCHEN VENTILS FÜR EINEN MOTOR MIT GETEILTEM ZYKLUS | [2010/20] | English: | HYDRO-MECHANICAL VALVE ACTUATION SYSTEM FOR SPLIT-CYCLE ENGINE | [2010/20] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACTIONNEMENT DE SOUPAPE HYDRO-MÉCANIQUE POUR MOTEUR À CYCLE DIVISÉ | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 02.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2307960 (MOIROUX AUGUSTE [FR]) [X] 1-5,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 6-13; | [Y]US5058538 (ERICKSON FREDERICK L [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH0742513 (ISUZU CERAMICS RES INST) [Y] 9-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03008785 (SCUDERI GROUP LLC [US]) [Y] 13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004050225 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5152258 (D ALFONSO NUNZIO [DE]); | [Y]US5154143 (STUTZENBERGER HEINZ [DE]); | [Y]US5058538 (ERICKSON FREDERICK L [US], et al); | [Y]US4000756 (ULE LOUIS A, et al); | [Y]US6880501 (SUH NAM P [US], et al); | [A]US5638781 (STURMAN ODED E [US]); | [A]US5119779 (PLOHBERGER DIETHARD [AT], et al); | [A]US6267098 (VANDERPOEL RICHARD [US]) |