EP2171870 - DIGITAL MICROWAVE RADIO SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH ENCRYPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Change - withdrawal | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgewave Communications, Inc. 3350 Thomas road Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAR-SADE, Idan 408 Offenbach Place Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
PASTERNAK, Eliezer 1831 Waverley Street Palo Alto 94301 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Bin 34319 Eucalyptus Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08780106.4 | 09.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US08491 | Priority number, date | US20070825879 | 09.07.2007 Original published format: US 825879 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009009107 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171870 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00, H04L9/00 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
H04K1/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L12/46 (EP,US);
H04L12/4604 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L9/0637 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H03M13/15 (EP,US);
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
H03M13/2707 (EP,US);
H04L1/0056 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | DIGITAL-MIKROWELLENFUNKSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT VERSCHLÜSSELUNG | [2010/14] | English: | DIGITAL MICROWAVE RADIO SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH ENCRYPTION | [2010/14] | French: | FAISCEAUX HERTZIENS NUMÉRIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ AVEC CRYPTAGE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 29.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/36] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/42] | 26.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2007153726 (BAR-SADE IDAN [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - Moss D, Hui J, Levis P, Choi J I, "CC2420 Radio Stack", (20070305), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://www.doc.tinyos.net/tinyos-2.x/doc/pdf/tep126.pdf, (20111116), XP002663829 [Y] 1-15 * page 8, paragraph 10.1 - page 9, paragraph 10.2 * | International search | [XY]US2007153726 (BAR-SADE IDAN [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 4-9, 13-18 and 22-26 * , abstract and para [0008]-[0009], [0011], [0013], [0015]-[0016], [0029]-[0037], [0039]-[0043], [0045]-[0046], [0048]-[0051], [0053]. * [Y] 3, 10-12, 19-21 and 27; | [Y]US2007014395 (JOSHI NIKHIL [US], et al) [Y] 3, 10-12 and 19-21 * , abstract and para [0018], [0025], [0032]-[0036], [0059]-[0060], [0064]. *; | [Y]US2006050870 (KIMMEL GERALD D [US], et al) [Y] 27 * , abstract and para [0047], [0127], [0129]-[0141], [0145]. *; | [A]US2006056620 (SHINGAL TONMOY [IN], et al) [A] 1-27 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0037]-[0043], [0050], [0059]-[0065], [0077]-[0082], [0092]-[0094], [0130], [0187]-[0207], [0231]-[0241]. * |