EP2144930 - SINGLE CHAIN FC, METHODS OF MAKING AND METHODS OF TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, Washington 98102 / US | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Margaret, D. 7771 57th Avenue NE Seattle, Washington 98115 / US | 02 /
SNAVELY, Marshall, D. 15706 NE 136th Place Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
FOX, Brian, A. 3925 Woodlawn Avenue N. Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | [2010/22] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
MOORE, Margaret, D. 7771 57th Avenue NE Seattle, Washington 98115 / US | ||
02 /
SNAVELY, Marshall, D. 15706 NE 136th Place Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | |||
03 /
FOX, Brian, A. 3925 Woodlawn Avenue N. Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | |||
04 /
HOYOS, Gabriela, H. 3939 SW Elmgrove Street Seattle, Washington 98136 / US | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08780548.7 | 18.04.2008 | [2010/03] | WO2008US60852 | Priority number, date | US20070912647P | 18.04.2007 Original published format: US 912647 P | US20070914682P | 27.04.2007 Original published format: US 914682 P | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008131242 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144930 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | EINZELKETTEN-FC SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND BEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/03] | English: | SINGLE CHAIN FC, METHODS OF MAKING AND METHODS OF TREATMENT | [2010/03] | French: | FC À CHAÎNE SIMPLE, PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT | [2010/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2005077981 (XENCOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,32,33,37,38,43-46,52,61,63,64,66,67,72-78 * the whole document * [Y] 12,14-31,34-36,39-42,47-51,53-60,62,65,68-71,79; | [Y]WO0246227 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [Y] 12,14,15,18,19,27,28,34-36,62,65 * page 79 - page 85; example 6 *; | [Y]WO2007038703 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 12,14,18,28,34,62,65 * sequences 175,180 *; | [Y]WO2006076594 (XENCOR INC [US], et al) [Y] 12,14,18,28,34,62,65 * example 4; sequence 480 *; | [Y]US2007071764 (SULLIVAN JOHN K [US], et al) [Y] 12,14,18,28,34,62,65 * sequence 83 *; | [Y]WO0238766 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [Y] 12,14,18,28,34,62,65 * page 146 - page 149; example 4; sequences 28,32 *; | [Y]WO9737029 (PROTEIN DESIGN LABS INC [US], et al) [Y] 16,17,26,27,29-31,41,42,50,51,58-60,70,71 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6387371 (HUDZIAK ROBERT M [US], et al) [Y] 20,21,39,40,48,49,55-57,68,69,79 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5807706 (CARTER PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 22-25 * column 1 - column 11 *; | [PX]WO2008012543 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [PX] 1,2,5-10,13,22,32,33,37,43,52,61,64,66 * the whole document *; | [X] - GREENWOOD J ET AL, "Engineering multiple-domain forms of the therapeutic antibody CAMPATH-1H: effects on complement lysis", THERAPEUTIC IMMUNOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBL. LONDON, GB, (19941001), vol. 1, no. 5, ISSN 0967-0149, pages 247 - 255, XP009059035 [X] 1-3,5,6,13,74,75 * page 248; figure 1 * | [Y] - GERBER HANS-PETER ET AL, "Mice expressing a humanized form of VEGF-A may provide insights into the safety and efficacy of anti-VEGF antibodies", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (20070227), vol. 104, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3478 - 3483, XP002481171 [Y] 26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0611492104 | [Y] - KANEKO Y ET AL, "Anti-Inflammatory Activity of Immunoglobulin G Resulting from Fc Sialylation", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (20060801), vol. 313, no. 5787, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 670 - 673, XP008076047 [Y] 44-47,53,54,57,60 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1129594 | [Y] - JENKINS N ET AL, "Genetic Engineering of alpha2,6-sialyltransferase in recombinant CHO cells", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, COLCHESTER, ESSEX, GB, (19980501), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0300-5127, page S115, XP009064116 [Y] 44-47,53,54,57,60 * the whole document * | [PX] - NAGASHIMA H ET AL, "Tandemly repeated Fc domain augments binding avidities of antibodies for Fcgamma receptors, resulting in enhanced antibody-dependent cellular cytotoxicity", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 45, no. 10, ISSN 0161-5890, (20080501), pages 2752 - 2763, (20080318), XP022605994 [PX] 1,2,5,6,13,32,33,43,52 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2008.02.003 | by applicant | WO2005077981 | WO0246227 | WO2007038703 | WO2006076594 | US2007071764 | WO0238766 | US6387371 | US5807706 | - RIDGWAY, "Knobs-into-holes' Engineering of Antibody Ch3 Domains for Heavy Chain Heterodimerization", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 617 - 621 | - CARTER, P., "Bispecific human IgG by design.", J. IMMUNOL. METH., (2001), vol. 248, pages 7 - 15 | - GREENWOOD J ET AL., THERAPEUTIC IMMUNOLOGY, (19941001), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 247 - 255 |