EP2171519 - ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS INCLUDING POLYURETHANE ADHESIVE LAYERS COMPRISING A CROSS-LINKING AGENT BASED ON EPOXIDISED VEGETABLE OIL FATTY ACIDS OR EPOXIDISED ESTERS OF SUCH FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/14] | ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS, AND MATERIALS FOR USE THEREIN | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | For all designated states Versum Materials US, LLC 8555 River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2017/38] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 1000 Technology Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821-4165 / US | ||
For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | |||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138-1002 / US | ||
For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAZEL, Shafiq N. 6704 Algonquin Trail Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US | 02 /
DANNER, Guy M. 11 Gibbens Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | 03 /
CAO, Lan 40 Brattle Street Unit 8 Arlington, Massachusetts 02476 / US | 04 /
MILLER, David D. 152 Prospect Street Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US | 05 /
KLINGENBERG, Eric H. 5144 Laurie Drive Emmaus, Pennsylvania 18095 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2010/24] | 01 /
FAZEL, Shafiq N. 6704 Algonquin Trail Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US | ||
02 /
DANNER, Guy M. 11 Gibbens Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | |||
03 /
CAO, Lan 40 Brattle Street Unit 8 Arlington, Massachusetts 02476 / US | |||
04 /
MILLER, David D. 152 Prospect Street Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US | |||
05 /
KLINGENBERG, Eric H. 5144 Laurie Drive Emmaus, Pennsylvania 18095 / US | |||
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
FAZEL, Shafiq N. 6704 Algonquin Trail Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US | ||
02 /
DANNER, Guy M. 11 Gibbens Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | |||
03 /
CAO, Lan Apartment No. 4 128 Everett Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | |||
04 /
MILLER, David D. 152 Prospect Street Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US | |||
05 /
KLINGENBERG, Eric H. 5144 Laurie Drive Emmaus, Pennsylvania 18095 / US | Representative(s) | Cole, David John, et al 46 Kirkhill Gardens West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | [2017/13] |
Former [2010/14] | Cole, David John, et al 46 Kirkhill Gardens, West Greenlees Estate Cambuslang Glasgow G72 8EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08781017.2 | 26.06.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US68323 | Priority number, date | US20070768395 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: US 768395 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003094 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171519 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2171519 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/167 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
C08G18/765 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0804 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,KR,US);
C09J175/08 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/167 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1675 (EP,US);
G02F2202/28 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | G02B26/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2010/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRO-OPTISCHE ANZEIGEN, DIE POLYURETHAN-KLEBSTOFFSCHICHTEN ENTHALTEN, UMFASSEND EINEN VERNETZER, DER AUS EPOXIDIERTEN PFLANZENÖL-FETTSÄUREN ODER EPOXIDIERTEN ESTERN SOLCHER FETTSÄUREN BESTEHT | [2016/46] | English: | ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS INCLUDING POLYURETHANE ADHESIVE LAYERS COMPRISING A CROSS-LINKING AGENT BASED ON EPOXIDISED VEGETABLE OIL FATTY ACIDS OR EPOXIDISED ESTERS OF SUCH FATTY ACIDS | [2016/46] | French: | AFFICHEURS ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUES INCLUANT DES COUCHES ADHÉSIVES EN POLYURÉTHANE COMPRENANT UN AGENT RÉTICULANT À BASE D'ACIDES GRAS ÉPOXYDÉS D'UN HUILE VÉGÉTALE OU D'ESTERS ÉPOXYDÉS DE TELS ACIDES GRAS | [2016/46] |
Former [2010/14] | ELEKTRO-OPTISCHE BILDSCHIRME UND STOFFE ZUR VERWENDUNG DARIN | ||
Former [2010/14] | ELECTRO-OPTIC DISPLAYS, AND MATERIALS FOR USE THEREIN | ||
Former [2010/14] | AFFICHAGES ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUES ET MATÉRIAUX À UTILISER À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 15.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.01.2011 | 02.08.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2008 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | IE | 26.06.2017 | IT | 26.06.2017 | LU | 26.06.2017 | MT | 26.06.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
IT | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
IT | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
IT | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
IT | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
IT | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2003292565 (ACHILLES CORP, et al) [X] 36 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 32-35; | [Y]US2006020062 (BLOOM PAUL D [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0062]; compound I * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * * example 6 * * pages 2-4 *; | [Y]US7173752 (DOSHI HARIT [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, lines 38-46 * * column 5, line 8 - column 8, line 19 * * column 17, line 24 - column 19, line 4; figures 3,4 * * column 22, lines 4-31 *; | [T] - ANDRÉ S. HARMSEN ET AL., "Crosslinking mechanisms - Binds for parquet flooring applications", EUROPEAN COATINGS JOURNAL, Hannover - Germany, (2003), vol. 5, page 13pp, XP002746127 [T] * page 1 - page 2; figure 4 * | [T] - H. Heydt, C. Jung, J. Hartmann-Schreier, "Römpp-Enzyklopedie - Fettsäuren", (201011), URL: https://roempp.thieme.de/roempp4.0/do/data/RD-06-00664, (20150629), XP002741554 [T] * the whole document * | [XA] - Nagase ChemTeX Corp., "Functional monomers - Denacol Master Catalog", (2005), URL: http://www.nagasechemtex.co.jp/en/products/denalist.html, (20151012), XP002745805 [X] 36 * the whole document * [A] 32-35 | [T] - S. S. Narine and X. Kong, "Vegetable Oils in Production of Polymers and Plastics", (2005), URL: http://www.google.de/url?sa=t&rct=j&q=&esrc=s&source=web&cd=1&ved=0CCIQFjAA&url=http%3A%2F%2Fwww.bioethanol.ru%2Fdownload_file.php%3Fdownload_propertys_items_id%3D3116&ei=hG2SVbfvAcO4UdvXi7gE&usg=AFQjCNGIbZvsHVAZa96Wmx3nt9xcv43BfQ&bvm=bv.96783405,d.d24, (20150629), XP002741555 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4383060 (DEARLOVE THOMAS J, et al); | [Y]US5621043 (CROFT THOMAS S [US]); | [Y]US2005122565 (DOSHI HARIT [US], et al); | [Y]US2006291034 (PATRY SHAMUS F [US], et al); | [Y]US7173752 (DOSHI HARIT [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007048096 (E INK CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006020062 | US7173752 | US7349148 |