EP2176443 - DIAMOND FILM DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Diamond Technologies, Inc. 426 B Weber Road 286 Romeoville, IL 60446 / US | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLISLE, John, A. 15259 Ingersoll Street Plainfield, IL 60544 / US | 02 /
WEST, Charles 339 W. Barry 11c Chicago, IL 60657 / US | 03 /
ZIMMER, Jerry 21260 Glenmont Drive Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/16] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08781572.6 | 09.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US69541 | Priority number, date | US20070775846 | 10.07.2007 Original published format: US 775846 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009009604 | Date: | 15.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2176443 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/27 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C23C16/279 (EP,US);
C23C16/271 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNG VON DIAMANTFILMEN | [2010/16] | English: | DIAMOND FILM DEPOSITION | [2010/16] | French: | DÉPÔT DE FILM EN DIAMANT | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 06.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2010 | 31.07.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007041381 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-65 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] *; | [X] - SOMMER M ET AL, "ACTIVITY OF TUNGSTEN AND RHENIUM FILAMENTS IN CH4/H2 AND C2H2/H2 MIXTURES: IMPORTANCE FOR DIAMOND CVD", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, WARRENDALE, PA, (19901101), vol. 5, no. 11, ISSN 0884-2914, pages 2433 - 2440, XP000198025 [X] 1-7,16,17,65 * see section II Experimental * | [AD] - WANG T ET AL, "The fabrication of nanocrystalline diamond films using hot filament CVD", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040101), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 6 - 13, XP004484574 [AD] 1-65 * page 6 - page 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diamond.2003.08.014 |