EP2201657 - POWER MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR AN INFUSION PUMP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bigfoot Biomedical, Inc. 1561 Buckeye Dr. Milpitas, CA 93035 / US | [2016/11] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Asante Solutions, Inc. 1012 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states M2 Group Holdings, Inc. 1012 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Steve 719 Holly Oak Dr. Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
MOCHEL, Ken 1021 W. Riverside Way San Jose, California 95129 / US | 03 /
RICH, David 2325 Dahlberg Drive Morgan Hill, California 95037 / US | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08781611.2 | 10.07.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008US69642 | Priority number, date | US20070852019 | 07.09.2007 Original published format: US 852019 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009035753 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2201657 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201657 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, H02J7/00, A61M5/142, // A61M5/145, A61M5/315 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61M5/1413 (EP,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/14566 (EP,US);
A61M5/16831 (US);
A61M5/172 (US);
F04D15/0066 (EP);
A61M2005/1402 (US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2005/16863 (US);
A61M2005/31518 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP,US);
A61M2205/276 (US);
A61M2205/3317 (US);
A61M2205/50 (US);
A61M2205/502 (US);
A61M2205/52 (US);
A61M2205/581 (US);
A61M2205/583 (US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8237 (US);
A61M2205/8262 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | H02J7/00, A61M5/142 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POWER-MANAGEMENT-TECHNIKEN FÜR EIN INFUSIONSPUMPENSYSTEM | [2010/26] | English: | POWER MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR AN INFUSION PUMP SYSTEM | [2010/26] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE POMPE DE PERFUSION | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 26.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2008 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0275213 (PACESETTER INFUSION LTD [US]) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US5717308 (NISHITANI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 6, line 11 - line 66; figures 5,8,10 *; | [X]WO0123277 (CARTLEDGE RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [PX]WO2007145951 (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC [US]) [PX] 1-12 * paragraph [0042]; figure - * |