EP2176380 - HYDROTREATING AND CATALYTIC DEWAXING PROCESS FOR MAKING DIESEL FROM OILS AND/OR FATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips 66 Company P.O. Box 4428 Houston, TX 77210 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Conocophillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford Road Houston, TX 77079 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHONASGI, DHANANJAY, B. 2424 Chapel Hill Ct. Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 02 /
SUGHRUE, EDWARD, L., II 6468 Clear Creek Loop Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 03 /
YAO, JIANHUA 1532 Whitney Lane Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 04 /
XU, XIAOCHUN 1929 Rolling Hills Drive Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Hyden, Martin Douglas, et al Finnegan Avenue Louise, 326 Box 37 1050 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2010/46] | Simpson, Paul Christopher, et al ConocoPhilips Limited Portman House 2 Portman Street London W1H 6DU / GB | ||
Former [2010/16] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08781797.9 | 14.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008US69967 | Priority number, date | US20070778295 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: US 778295 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009012217 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176380 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/00 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
C10G3/46 (EP,US);
C10G3/49 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1014 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1018 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1048 (EP,US);
C10G2300/107 (EP,US);
C10G2300/304 (EP,US);
C10G2300/4018 (EP,US);
C10G2300/802 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HYDROTREATING UND ZUR KATALYTISCHEN ENTPARAFFINIERUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIESEL AUS ÖLEN UND/ODER FETTEN | [2010/16] | English: | HYDROTREATING AND CATALYTIC DEWAXING PROCESS FOR MAKING DIESEL FROM OILS AND/OR FATS | [2010/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HYDROTRAITEMENT ET DE DÉPARAFFINAGE CATALYTIQUE POUR PRÉPARER DU DIESEL À PARTIR D'HUILES ET/OU DE GRAISSES | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 18.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006100584 (LOPMENT AUTHORITY BEN GURION U [IL], et al) [X] 1-18 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2006264684 (PETRI JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1795576 (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI]) [X] 1-18* example -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US4743354 (WARD JOHN W [US]); | [A]US2003143135 (O'REAR DENNIS J [US], et al); | [Y]US2003178344 (PLANTENGA FRANS LODEWIJK [NL], et al); | [A]US2004033908 (DECKMAN DOUGLAS E [US], et al); | [A]US2004154958 (ALEXANDER ALBERT GORDON [CA], et al); | [A]US2006175231 (HANSEN JENS A [DK], et al); | [A]US2006247332 (COFFEY JAMES N [US], et al); | [X]US2007010682 (MYLLYOJA JUKKA [FI], et al); | [A]US2007142242 (GLEESON JAMES W [US], et al) |