EP2179596 - DIAPHONIC ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCTION COUPLER AND EAR BUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asius Technologies, Llc 14525 S.W. Millikan 41094 Beaverton, OR 97005-2343 / US | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBROSE, Stephen, D. 14525 S.W. Millikan 41094 Beaverton, OR 97005-2343 / US | 02 /
GIDO, Samuel, P. 56 Hungtington Road Hadley, MA 10135 / US | 03 /
WEIDISCH, Roland Johannes-R.-Becher St. 86 39218 Schonebeck / DE | 04 /
SCHULEIN, Robert, B. 101 E. Monterey Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | 05 /
MAYS, Jimmy W. 3829 Dellwood Drive Knoxville, TN 37919 / US | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2010/17] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08782266.4 | 23.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008US70896 | Priority number, date | US20070951420P | 23.07.2007 Original published format: US 951420 P | US20080038333 | 20.03.2008 Original published format: US 38333 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009015210 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2179596 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R1/1091 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | DIAPHONISCHER AKUSTISCHER TRANSDUKTIONSKOPPLER UND OHRHÖRER | [2010/17] | English: | DIAPHONIC ACOUSTIC TRANSDUCTION COUPLER AND EAR BUD | [2010/17] | French: | COUPLEUR DE TRANSDUCTION ACOUSTIQUE DIAPHONIQUE ET ÉCOUTEUR BOUTON | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 03.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/27] | 03.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.05.2015 | 06.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3985960 (WALLACE JR ROBERT LEE) [A] 1-27 * figure 2 * * column 2, lines 41-49 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 5 * * column 6, lines 15-25 *; | [XYI]DE2913644 (WULLSTEIN HORST L PROF DR MED) [X] 1,2,5,6,13,14,18,20-22 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 8 * * page 4, line 1 * * page 5, lines 19-27 * * page 7, lines 26-31 * * page 6, lines 27-30 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,7,8 [I] 9-12,15-17,19; | [Y]DE4300804 (ZAPLETAL FRITZ [DE]) [Y] 3,4,7,8 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE10138613 (KAMMERMEIER SIMON [DE], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2004187953 (RION CO, et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102005016018 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [A]US2007116319 (HAGBERG PATRIK [SE]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] * * figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US4009707 (WARD JOHN W); | [A]KR900013806 (KOSS CORP [US]); | [A]US5063946 (WADA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]JPH06335473 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD) |