EP2173908 - ULTRACONSERVED REGIONS ENCODING NCRNAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210-1063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROCE, Carlo, M. 2140 Cambridge Boulevard Columbus, OH 43221 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Turner, Craig Robert, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Turner, Craig Robert, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 08782609.5 | 04.08.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008US72081 | Priority number, date | US20070963329P | 03.08.2007 Original published format: US 963329 P | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009020905 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2173908 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2173908 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61P35/00, A61K48/00 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/11 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2320/10 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2330/10 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ULTRAKONSERVIERTE BEREICHE ZUR KODIERUNG VON NCRNAS | [2010/15] | English: | ULTRACONSERVED REGIONS ENCODING NCRNAS | [2010/15] | French: | RÉGIONS ULTRA-CONSERVÉES CODANT POUR DES ARNNC | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 05.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13175160.4 / EP2650383 | EP13175161.2 / EP2653561 | EP13175167.9 / EP2657353 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2008 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | IE | 04.08.2016 | LU | 04.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.08.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.08.2008 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002132290 (FRAZER KELLY A [US], et al) [X] 11-15 * abstract * * sequences 1-90 *; | [X]US2005164252 (YEUNG WAH HIN A [HK]) [X] 11-15 * abstract ** claim 1 *; | [A] - SASAKI YASNORY T F ET AL, "Coordinated expression of ncRNAs and HOX mRNAs in the human HOXA locus.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS 8 JUN 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17445766, (20070608), vol. 357, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 724 - 730, XP002601778 [A] 1-15 * page 272 - page 279 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BBRC.2007.03.200 | [A] - BEJERANO GILL ET AL, "Ultraconserved elements in the human genome.", SCIENCE (NEW YORK, N.Y.) 28 MAY 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15131266, (20040528), vol. 304, no. 5675, ISSN 1095-9203, pages 1321 - 1325, XP002601779 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1098119 | [XP] - CALIN GEORGE A ET AL, "Ultraconserved regions encoding ncRNAs are altered in human leukemias and carcinomas.", CANCER CELL SEP 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17785203, (200709), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1535-6108, pages 215 - 229, XP002601780 [XP] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CCR.2007.07.027 | [T] - BAIRA EIRINI ET AL, "Ultraconserved elements: genomics, function and disease.", RNA BIOLOGY 2008 JUL-SEP LNKD- PUBMED:18708752, (200807), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1555-8584, pages 132 - 134, XP002601781 [T] * abstract * * page 133, column 2 * | International search | [X]US2006105360 (CROCE CARLO M [US], et al); | [Y] - BEJERANO ET AL., "Ultraconserved Elements in the Human Genome.", SCIENCE, (20040528), vol. 304, no. 5675, pages 1321 - 1325, XP002601779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1098119 | [Y] - WANG ET AL., "Ontogeny and oncogenesis balance the transcriptional profile of renal cell cancer.", CANCER RESEARCH, (20041015), vol. 64, no. 20, pages 7279 - 7287, XP008128418 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-1597 | [XP] - CALIN ET AL., "Ultraconserved regions encoding ncRNAs are altered in human leukemias and carcinomas.", CANCER CELL, (200709), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 215 - 225, XP008128310 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2007.07.027 |