EP2115448 - A HAND-HELD PHASE-SHIFT DETECTOR FOR SENSOR APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drexel University 3141 Chestnut Street Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIH, Wan Y. 641 Heather Lane Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania 19010 / US | 02 /
SHIH, Wei-Heng 641 Heather Lane Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania 19010 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker & Associates, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2009/46] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 08782746.5 | 30.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008US52388 | Priority number, date | US20070887686P | 01.02.2007 Original published format: US 887686 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008109205 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2115448 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/72, G01N29/02 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
G01N29/075 (EP,US);
G01N29/226 (EP,US);
G01N29/245 (EP,US);
G01N29/34 (EP,US);
G01N2291/012 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02466 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | G01N27/72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | TRAGBARER PHASENVERSCHIEBUNGSDETEKTOR FÜR SENSORANWENDUNGEN | [2009/46] | English: | A HAND-HELD PHASE-SHIFT DETECTOR FOR SENSOR APPLICATIONS | [2009/46] | French: | DETECTEUR A DEPHASAGE A MAIN POUR APPLICATIONS DE DETECTION | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.05.2012 | 31.01.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5763283 (CERNOSEK RICHARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 22 - line 24 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US6823720 (ADKINS DOUGLAS RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 20 *; | [A]US6955787 (HANSON WILLIAM PAYNTER [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 7, line 21 - line 62 ** figures 10, 11 *; | [X]WO2006039506 (NEVADA SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 16, line 9 - page 17, line 7 * * page 30, line 8 - page 31, line 11 * * figures 1, 2, 10 *; | [X] - AUGE J ET AL, "High-speed multi-parameter data acquisition and web-based remote access to resonant sensors and sensor arrays", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL: INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL TRANSDUCERS, ELSEVIER S.A, SWITZERLAND, (20031015), vol. 95, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0925-4005(03)00398-8, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 32 - 38, XP004454645 [X] 1-12 * paragraph [004.] * * figures 6, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(03)00398-8 | International search | [Y]US5445008 (WACHTER ERIC A [US], et al); | [Y]US5719324 (THUNDAT THOMAS G [US], et al); | [A]US6289717 (THUNDAT THOMAS G [US], et al); | [A]US2005112621 (KIM TAE S [KR], et al); | [A]KR100583233B (KOREA INST. OF SCI. AND TECH.); | [X]US2006257286 (ADAMS JESSE D [US]) |