EP2131765 - SYSTEM FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SPINAL SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/51] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SPINAL SURGERY | ||
[2015/15] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Spine, Inc. 7375 Bush Lake Road Minneapolis, MN 55439 / US | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESTAD, Hugh, D. 6121 Abbott Avenue, S. Edina, MN 55410 / US | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08782768.9 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US52553 | Priority number, date | US20070686453 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: US 686453 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008112350 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2131765 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/56, A61B17/58, A61F2/30, A61F4/00, A61F5/00 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/7085 (EP,US);
A61B17/7031 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | A61B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE WIRBELSÄULENCHIRURGIE | [2015/15] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SPINAL SURGERY | [2015/15] | French: | SYSTÈME UTILISÉS POUR UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE RACHIDIENNE MINIMALEMENT INVASIVE | [2015/15] |
Former [2009/51] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE WIRBELSÄULENCHIRURGIE | ||
Former [2009/51] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE SPINAL SURGERY | ||
Former [2009/51] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ UTILISÉS POUR UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE RACHIDIENNE MINIMALEMENT INVASIVE | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 25.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2010 | 31.01.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005060526 (DEPUY SPINE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 16; figure 2 *; | [A]WO0200126 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 17,18 *; | [A]US2004215190 (NGUYEN THANH V [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 38-46 * | International search | [X]US2006247630 (IOTT ANDREW [US], et al); | [Y]US2002082523 (KINSELLA BRYAN [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2005060526 | US20050228958 |