EP2162007 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BRINGING INTO POSITION AND ARRANGING A CARCASS OR CARCASS PART OF SLAUGHTERED POULTRY ON OR IN A PRODUCT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | [2010/33] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states STORK PMT B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDDINK, Wilbert 10 Rademakersbroet NL-7051 HC Varsseveld / NL | 02 /
KROOT, Marc 6 Steenakker NL-5845 EZ Sint Anthonis / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN NIEUWELAAR, Adrianus, Josephes 33 Den Hoek NL-5421 XG Gemert / NL | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Wolterink, Isabelle Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | De Grave-Wolterink, Isabelle Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2010/11] | De Grave-Wolterink, Isabelle EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE RIJSWIJK / NL | Application number, filing date | 08782788.7 | 23.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008NL00159 | Priority number, date | NL20071034027 | 22.06.2007 Original published format: NL 1034027 | NL20082001241 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: NL 2001241 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009002153 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2162007 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162007 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A22C21/00 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
A22C21/0053 (EP,US);
A22C21/003 (EP,US);
A22C21/0046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG UND ANORDNUNG EINES KADAVERS ODER KADAVERTEILS VON GESCHLACHTETEM GEFLÜGEL AUF ODER IN EINEM PRODUKTTRÄGER | [2010/11] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BRINGING INTO POSITION AND ARRANGING A CARCASS OR CARCASS PART OF SLAUGHTERED POULTRY ON OR IN A PRODUCT CARRIER | [2010/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR AMENER EN POSITION ET AGENCER UNE CARCASSE OU UNE PARTIE DE CARCASSE D'UNE VOLAILLE ABATTUE SUR UN SUPPORT DE PRODUIT OU DANS CELUI-CI | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11178825.3 / EP2389812 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2008 | AT | 14.03.2012 | BE | 14.03.2012 | CY | 14.03.2012 | CZ | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | HR | 14.03.2012 | LT | 14.03.2012 | LV | 14.03.2012 | MT | 14.03.2012 | PL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SE | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | NO | 14.06.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | IE | 23.06.2012 | LU | 23.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | IS | 14.07.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.06.2012 | ||
LU | 23.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IE | 23.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.03.2012 | |
BE | 14.03.2012 | ||
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
SE | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 14.03.2012 | |
CY | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 14.03.2012 | |
NO | 14.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]NL8201782 (STOLLE GMBH & CO KG GEB) [X] 1-4,6-8,20,24,29-36,40,43-46,48,49,51,52 * the whole document * [A] 5,41,42,47; | [A]US4873746 (SCHEIER DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, lines 39-51; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]EP0756826 (STORK PMT [NL]) [X] 1-4,7-9,13,31-34,43,44,48-50 * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 40; figures 3a,4a * [A] 14-17,51 | by applicant | NL8201782 | EP0756826 |