EP2162511 - REMOVAL OF AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM COKING GAS BY ABSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2015/08] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIELERT, Holger Westerwikstrasse 38 44379 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
WOZNY, Günter Karl-Marx-Strasse 29 16548 Gliencke / DE | 03 /
RICHTER, Diethmar An der Wasserburg 39 44379 Dortmund / DE | [2010/17] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
THIELERT, Holger Westerwikstrasse 38 44379 Dortmund / DE | ||
02 /
WOZNY, Günter Karl-Marx-Strasse 29 16548 Gliencke / DE | |||
03 /
RICHTER, Diethmar Wilsnacker Strasse 61 10559 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | ||
Former [N/P] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/11] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08784561.6 | 27.06.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008EP05253 | Priority number, date | DE20071030367 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: DE102007030367 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003644 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2162511 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162511 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10K1/16, B01D53/14 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/1487 (EP,US);
C10K1/16 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/14 (KR);
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D2257/7027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON AROMATISCHEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN AUS KOKEREIGAS DURCH ABSORPTION | [2010/11] | English: | REMOVAL OF AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS FROM COKING GAS BY ABSORPTION | [2010/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION D'HYDROCARBURES AROMATIQUES DE GAZ DE COKERIE PAR ABSORPTION | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 08.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2008 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MT | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | IE | 27.06.2016 | LU | 27.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 27.06.2008 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.06.2008 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.06.2008 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | DK | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | DK | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 06.04.2016 | |
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NO | 06.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5163384 (TSUBOI SUEJI, et al) [A] 1-9; | [A]DE19824747 (HATTINGEN ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] * claim 2 *; | [A]DE102005009625 (SIEVERS FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] * | [A] - KUZ'MINA E YA ET AL, "A NEW PETROLEUM WASH OIL TO RECOVER CRUDE BENZOL.", COKE AND CHEMISTRY U.S.S.R., (1987), no. 12, pages 45 - 49, XP002498343 [A] 1-9 * page 47; table 3 * | [A] - "SOLVENT VAPOUR SEPN FROM WASTE GAS - USING (M)ETHYLESTER OF ANIMAL AND VEGETABLE FATTY ACID", PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, XX, XX, (19760101), page 6, XP001050197 [A] 1-9 * abstract * |