EP2210010 - BRAKE LINING SET HAVING DIFFERENT COMPRESSIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Friction Products GmbH Otto-Hahn-Strasse 26-28 65520 Bad Camberg / DE | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMETT, Robert 46, Willow Park Road York, YO41 5PS / GB | 02 /
PAUL, Hans, Guenther Am Wiesenhang 10 56593 Horhausen / DE | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus, Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [2010/30] | Application number, filing date | 08784786.9 | 15.07.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008EP05778 | Priority number, date | DE20071048363 | 09.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007048363 | [2010/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009049696 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210010 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/092 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
F16D65/092 (EP,US);
F16D2069/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | BREMSBELAGSATZ MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHER KOMPRESSIBILITÄT | [2010/30] | English: | BRAKE LINING SET HAVING DIFFERENT COMPRESSIBILITY | [2010/30] | French: | JEU DE GARNITURES DE FREIN À COMPRESSIBILITÉ DIFFÉRENTE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 07.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10055796 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9-11,15,16 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019]; figure - *; | [A]EP0848181 (TEXTAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]GB2080454 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 109 - page 3, line 18; figure - *; | [A]JPS5442569 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |