EP2193066 - COUPLING DEVICE FOR RELEASABLY ATTACHING ACCESSORIES TO A BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mühlberger GmbH Bonner Wall 118 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states Mühlberger Gmbh Bonner Wall 118 50677 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜHLBERGER, Alois Bonner Wall 118 50677 Köln / DE | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2010/23] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785065.7 | 25.07.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008EP06112 | Priority number, date | DE20072013296U | 21.09.2007 Original published format: DE 202007013296 U | DE20072016987U | 05.12.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016987 U | DE20082002164U | 16.02.2008 Original published format: DE 202008002164 U | DE20082002325U | 20.02.2008 Original published format: DE 202008002325 U | DE20082003149U | 05.03.2008 Original published format: DE 202008003149 U | DE20082006275U | 07.05.2008 Original published format: DE 202008006275 U | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009039910 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2193066 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193066 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62J11/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B62J9/27 (EP,US);
B62J9/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | KOPPELVORRICHTUNG ZUM LÖSBAREN ANBRINGEN VON ZUBEHÖR AN EINEM FAHRRAD | [2010/23] | English: | COUPLING DEVICE FOR RELEASABLY ATTACHING ACCESSORIES TO A BICYCLE | [2010/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR LA FIXATION AMOVIBLE D'ACCESSOIRES SUR UN CYCLE | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 22.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2008 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | HR | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | MT | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | NO | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
MT | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
HR | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
NO | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]BE332169 (FICHTEL & SACHS) [X] 1-7* figure - *; | [X]US3007743 (LANGE MARVIN C) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB976555 (SANCA IND LTD) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [X]US4830239 (TACKLES GEORGE J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE9418636U (TSAI RICHARD [TW]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * page 3 - page 8; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE4334315 (RIXEN & KAUL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US5427285 (KREITZMAN RALPH J [US]) [X] 1-7,10 * figures 1,4-8 *; | [XY]DE29507577U (EQUUS INC [KR]) [X] 1-7,10 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [X]US5619815 (GREENE DENNIS [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29704283U (GREINER HARALD [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE19713704 (RIXEN & KAUL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29914421U (ECHOWELL ELECTRONIC CO [TW]) [X] 1-7,10 * page 6 - page 9; figures 1a-1d,2,3 *; | [X]US6186383 (KOBDISH ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1-7,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE20214809U (LING RENNY TSE HAW [TW]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03084805 (ZAMPIERI PIERCARLO [IT]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005051711 (LEV RAN AMI [IL], et al) [X] 1-7,10 * page 5 - page 14 * | by applicant | DE29914421U |