EP2188881 - ELECTRIC MOTOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPSKAMP, Torsten Merianstr. 42 75015 Bretten / DE | 02 /
NESTLER, Helmut Holzmann 33a 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
EPSKAMP, Torsten Auf den Lohn 12 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
NESTLER, Helmut Holzmann 33a 76646 Bruchsal / DE | Representative(s) | Tüngler, Eberhard, et al Sew-Eurodrive Ernst-Blickle-Straße 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Tüngler, Eberhard, et al Sew-Eurodrive Ernst-Blickle-Straße 42 D-76646 Bruchsal / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Tüngler, Eberhard, et al Sew-Eurodrive Ernst-Blickle-Straße 42 D-76646 Bruchsal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08785245.5 | 31.07.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008EP06303 | Priority number, date | DE20071038687 | 15.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007038687 | [2010/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009021634 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2188881 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188881 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K1/28, H02K15/03 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
H02K1/2733 (EP);
H02K1/28 (EP);
H02K2201/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTROMOTORS | [2010/21] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2010/21] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 07.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2008 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4009406 (INARIBA TOKUZO) [X] 1-6,12 * column 3, line 46 * * column 4, line 23 - line 41 * * figures 1-4,5a,5b * [Y] 7-10; | [XY]JPS63257444 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-6,10,13,14 * abstract * [Y] 7; | [XY]US4782259 (SHIKAMA SHUUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-8 * [Y] 7-10; | [XY]JPH1014181 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-6,10,13,14 * abstract * [Y] 7; | [XY]US2002047431 (FUKUSHIMA TETSUHARU [JP]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * page 3, paragraph 39 - paragraph 43; figures 3-5 * [Y] 7-10; | [Y]EP1737105 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7-10 * column 2, line 13 - line 17 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 34 * * column 8, line 9 - line 29 ** figure 11 * |