EP2176627 - PIPELINE OR MEASURING TUBE HAVING AT LEAST ONE LAYER WHICH INSULATES AT LEAST IN CERTAIN REGIONS, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIGT, Frank Domhofstrasse 6 79576 Weil Am Rhein / DE | 02 /
WOHLGEMUTH, Werner Hochwaldstrasse 6 CH-4206 Seewen / CH | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 08786024.3 | 10.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP58967 | Priority number, date | DE20071038507 | 14.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007038507 | [2010/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009021787 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176627 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176627 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
G01F1/58 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROHRLEITUNG BZW. MESSROHR MIT MINDESTENS EINER, MINDESTENS BEREICHSWEISE ISOLIERENDEN SCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2010/16] | English: | PIPELINE OR MEASURING TUBE HAVING AT LEAST ONE LAYER WHICH INSULATES AT LEAST IN CERTAIN REGIONS, AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2010/16] | French: | CONDUIT TUBULAIRE OU TUBE DE MESURE PRÉSENTANT AU MOINS UNE COUCHE DONT AU MOINS CERTAINES PARTIES SONT ISOLANTES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2008 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MT | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | AT | 10.07.2017 | IE | 10.07.2017 | LU | 10.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | NO | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | IS | 30.09.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
AT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
AT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.07.2008 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
AT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
AT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
AT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
IE | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 31.05.2017 | |
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 31.05.2017 | |
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
NO | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
IS | 30.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0036513 (FISCHER & PORTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,11-13* the whole document *; | [X]JPS59137822 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) [X] 1,6-8,11-13 * abstract *; | [XD]EP0581017 (KROHNE AG [CH]) [XD] 1-3,6-13 * column 4 - column 7; figure - *; | [XD]EP1039269 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [XD] 1-3,6-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0126]; figure - *; | [X]US6658720 (FREY DANIEL [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15 * column 8 - column 16; figure - * |