EP2195164 - PRINTING UNIT HAVING AT LEAST TWO LATERAL FRAME PARTS THE DISTANCE OF WHICH CAN BE CHANGED RELATIVE TO EACH OTHER IN A HORIZONTAL DIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜBERT, Thomas Harrbacherweg 32 97753 Karlstadt / DE | 02 /
MASUCH, Bernd, Kurt Am Tiergarten 51 97273 Kürnach / DE | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/10] | Application number, filing date | 08786073.0 | 11.07.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008EP59073 | Priority number, date | DE20071000863 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007000863 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009049936 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195164 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195164 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B41F13/0024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | DRUCKEINHEIT MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI RELATIV ZUEINANDER IN EINER HORIZONTALEN RICHTUNG ABSTANDSVERÄNDERBAREN SEITENGESTELLTEILEN | [2010/24] | English: | PRINTING UNIT HAVING AT LEAST TWO LATERAL FRAME PARTS THE DISTANCE OF WHICH CAN BE CHANGED RELATIVE TO EACH OTHER IN A HORIZONTAL DIRECTION | [2010/24] | French: | UNITÉ D'IMPRESSION AVEC AU MOINS DEUX PARTIES LATÉRALES ESPACABLES HORIZONTALEMENT DE MANIERE VARIABLE | [2011/42] |
Former [2010/24] | UNITÉ D'IMPRESSION AVEC AU MOINS DEUX PARTIES LATÉRALES DE BÂTI DONT L'ESPACEMENT MUTUEL EN DIRECTION HORIZONTALE EST VARIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2008 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | IE | 11.07.2012 | LU | 11.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LU | 11.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 11.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 11.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 11.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0749369 (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG [DE]) [DA] 1-45* the whole document *; | [YA]DE10017507 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-23,34-45 * paragraphs [0015] - [0036]; figures 1-3 * [A] 24-33; | [YA]EP1149694 (MIYAKOSHI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [Y] 1-23,34-45 * paragraphs [0021] - [0042]; figures 1-11 * [A] 24-33; | [A]EP1500500 (FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005037553 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-45 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0749369 | DE10017507 | EP1149694 | EP1500500 | WO2005037553 | WO2005037552 | DE60118827T | EP1767359 | - HALBZEUGE AUS ZEDEX 100, pages 3 - 11 | - ZEDEX 100 UND DIE TRIBOLOGIE, pages 15 - 23 |