EP2167764 - INSTALLATION AID FOR A MORTISE LOCK, AND MORTISE LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CESlocks GmbH Mettmanner Strasse 119 42549 Velbert / DE | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜPPER, Ingo Bismarckstr. 23 40822 Mettmann / DE | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner Corneliusstraße 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 08786107.6 | 14.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008EP59150 | Priority number, date | DE20072009890U | 16.07.2007 Original published format: DE 202007009890 U | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009010484 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167764 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2167764 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05B15/02, E05B63/04 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
E05B63/044 (EP);
E05B15/0205 (EP);
E05B17/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | MONTAGEHILFSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN EINSTECKSCHLOSS SOWIE EINSTECKSCHLOSS | [2010/13] | English: | INSTALLATION AID FOR A MORTISE LOCK, AND MORTISE LOCK | [2010/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE AU MONTAGE POUR UNE SERRURE À MORTAISE ET SERRURE À MORTAISE | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 27.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HR | 29.06.2011 | HU | 29.06.2011 | IE | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MT | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | NO | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | ES | 10.10.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 10.10.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 29.06.2011 | |
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
IE | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
HR | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
NO | 29.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
NO | 29.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE338464 (ERNST BAUER) [DA] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE2425144 (SCHULTE SCHLAGBAUM AG) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [AD]DE3342156 (GRIEPENSTROH WALTER [DE]) [AD] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]FR2783271 (DEVISMES [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 30 - page 7, line 11; figures 1-5 * |