EP2175852 - N-(2-THIAZOLYL)-AMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY, DIABETES AND CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeltia, S.A. José Abascal, 2 - 1° 28003 Madrid / ES | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTÍNEZ GIL, Ana Noscira S.A. Avda. de la Industria 52 E-28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
ALONSO CASCÓN, Mercedes Noscira S.A. Avda. dela Industria 52 E-28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | 03 /
SANTAMARÍA NÚÑEZ, Gema Pharma Mar S.A. Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo (Madrid) / ES | 04 /
MARTÍNEZ DÍEZ, Marta Pharma Mar S.A. Avda. de los Reyes 1 Polígono Industrial La Mina-Norte E-28770 Colmenar Viejo (Madrid) / ES | 05 /
LÓPEZ OGALLA, Javier Noscira S.A. Avda. de la Industria 52 E-28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08786730.5 | 01.08.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008EP60109 | Priority number, date | EP20070380231 | 03.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07380231 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009019202 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175852 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/427, A61K31/4439, C07D417/12, A61P43/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61P3/00, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P3/06 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Extension states | AL | 03.02.2010 | BA | 03.02.2010 | MK | 03.02.2010 | RS | 03.02.2010 | Title | German: | N-(2-THIAZOLYL)-AMIDDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS, DIABETES UND HERZ-KREISLAUF-ERKRANKUNGEN | [2010/16] | English: | N-(2-THIAZOLYL)-AMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY, DIABETES AND CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES | [2010/16] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE N-(2-THIAZOLYL)-AMIDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ, DU DIABÈTE ET DE MALADIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0026202 (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 34 - page 6, line 11 * * page 14, line 2 - line 3 * * page 16, line 15 - line 18 ** page 26, line 37 - line 38; claim - *; | [A]CN1580056 (SHANG MEDICINE INST CHINESE AC [CN]) [A] 1-15 * example - *; | [A]EP1532980 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 21 - paragraph 22 * * page 11, paragraph 94 - page 29, paragraph 101; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP1849785 (NEUROPHARMA SA [ES]) [PX] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 4, paragraph 18 - page 6, paragraph 21 * * page 7, paragraph 27 - page 9, paragraph 29 * * page 11, paragraph 47; example 2; claim - *; | [PX]WO2007125110 (NEUROPHARMA SA [ES], et al) [PX] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 7, line 9 - page 9, line 10; claim -; table 1 *; | [X] - "1H-Indazole-3-carboxamide, N-2-thiazolyl", REGISTRY, STN, (20070417), URL: STN, XP002470947 [X] 12 * RN: 930471-56-0 * | [ ] - NAN, FAJUN ET AL, "Preparation of thiazole derivatives as anti-infective agents", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2006:292684, URL: STN, XP002470948 [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | WO0026202 | EP1532980 | EP1849785 | WO2007125110 |