EP2188969 - TRACKING THE ORIGINS OF DATA AND CONTROLLING DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Julian, Lawrence 37 The Dell Milton Road Southampton Hampshire SO15 2PF / GB | 02 /
VERDON, Peter Begger's Roost Farnham Road Odiham Hampshire RG29 1AB / GB | [2015/43] |
Former [2010/21] | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Julian, Lawrence 37 The Dell Milton Road Southampton Hampshire SO15 2PF / GB | ||
02 /
VERDON, Peter Begger`s Roost Farnham Road Odiham Hampshire RG29 1AB / GB | Representative(s) | Shaw, Anita IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Shaw, Anita IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Sekar, Anita IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 08786897.2 | 05.08.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008EP60289 | Priority number, date | EP20070114359 | 15.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07114359 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009021881 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2188969 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188969 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/00 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
H04L63/126 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2149 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG DER URSPRÜNGE VON DATEN UND STEUERUNG VON DATENÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2010/21] | English: | TRACKING THE ORIGINS OF DATA AND CONTROLLING DATA TRANSMISSION | [2010/21] | French: | SUIVI DES ORIGINES DE DONNÉES ET CONTRÔLE DE LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2008 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 05.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2007107057 (CHANDER AJAY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,12-16,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] *[I] 5,7,11,17; | [XI] - David Flanagan, Javascript: The Definitive Guide, O'Reilly Media, Inc, (20060817), ISBN 0-596-10199-6, XP002517763 [X] 1,4,6,9-10,12-16,18 * paragraph [13.8.2] * [I] 2-3,5,7-8,11,17 | by applicant | US2007107057 |