EP2185647 - (PER)FLUOROELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Via Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Solvay Solexis S.p.A. Via Turati, 12 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANZONI, Claudia Via della Barca 21/4 I-40100 Bologna / IT | 02 /
COMINO, Giovanni Via Enrico da Monza 24 I-20052 Monza (MI) / IT | 03 /
STANGA, Milena Via alla Cascina Muschiona 26 I-21040 Origgio (VA) / IT | 04 /
ALBANO, Margherita Via Donatello 21 I-20131 Milano / IT | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 08787085.3 | 11.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008EP60510 | Priority number, date | EP20070425543 | 29.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07425543 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009027213 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185647 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185647 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/16, C08L27/12 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C08L27/16 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/16, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | (PER)FLUORELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/20] | English: | (PER)FLUOROELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS | [2010/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS (PER)FLUOROÉLASTOMÈRES | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 18.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2008 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 11.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0434046 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [DY] 1-17 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0924257 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-17 * examples 6-8; claim - *; | [Y]US2006041069 (SUMI NAOKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * examples "2-1","2-2"; claim - *; | [A]WO2005056618 (DUPONT DOW ELASTOMERS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * example -; claim - * |