EP2186187 - METHOD FOR SLOWING-DOWN CONTROL OF AN ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZITZLER, Stefan Prissather Weg 17 92421 Schwandorf / DE | 02 /
HERTZ, Dirk Am Riedholz 9 92260 Fichtenhof / DE | 03 /
RUNGGALDIER, Diethard Amselweg 5 96135 Stegaurach / DE | [2010/20] | Application number, filing date | 08787143.0 | 12.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008EP60588 | Priority number, date | EP20070017244 | 03.09.2007 Original published format: EP 07017244 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009030584 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2186187 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02P3/20, H02P3/24 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
H02P3/20 (EP,US);
H02P3/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLAUFSTEUERUNG EINER ASYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2010/20] | English: | METHOD FOR SLOWING-DOWN CONTROL OF AN ASYNCHRONOUS MACHINE | [2010/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER L'ARRÊT D'UNE MACHINE ASYNCHRONE | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 30.08.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8707425U (BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG, 6800 MANNHEIM, DE) [A] 1 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 4 *; | [A]DE4310485 (KIMO IND ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 13 - line 19 *; | [A]WO0171902 (ALTENDORF WILHELM GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Reduced stopping time with a soft starter", LMPFORUM, (20050912), URL: http://www.lmpforum.com/inforum/Reduced-stopping-time-s-t797.html&pid=2360&mode=threaded, (20090512), XP002527582 [A] 1 * Zweiter Beitrag, vorletzter Absatz * | [A] - PLACHETKA S, "MIT ODER GEGEN DEN STROM DREHSTROMMOTOREN SICHER BREMSEN", ELEKTROTECHNIK, VOGEL VERLAG K.G. WURZBURG, DE, (19940613), vol. 76, no. 6, ISSN 1431-9578, pages 30 - 32, XP000438395 [A] 1 * page 1, column 3 - page 2, column 1 * | [A] - PLACHETKA S, "ZUVERLAESSIGE ABBREMSUNG VON DREHSTROMMOTOREN, TEIL 2", UND- ODER- NOR + STEUERUNGSTECHNIK, DISTRIBUTION VERLAG GMBH. MAINZ, DE, (19920501), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 26 - 27, XP000304462 [A] * page 1, column 2, paragraph 28 - paragraph 31 * |