EP2178506 - PREPARATION OF COMPOSITIONS WITH ESSENTIALLY NONCRYSTALLINE EMBEDDED MACROLIDE ANTIBIOTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co KG Max-Planck-Ring 2a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTEDT, Ulrich Weinheimer Str. 2 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 02 /
ROSENBERG, Jörg Bruchstr. 29 67158 Ellerstadt / DE | 03 /
KNOBLOCH, Martin Medenheimer Str. 22a 67141 Neuhofen / DE | 04 /
STEIGER, Norbert Druslachstr. 1 67360 Lingenfeld / DE | 05 /
HACH, Harald Weissenburgerstr. 2 76889 Oberottenbach / DE | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08787236.2 | 14.08.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008EP60706 | Priority number, date | EP20070114569 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07114569 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009024535 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178506 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178506 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K31/7048, A61K31/7052, B29C47/40, B29C47/60, B29C47/64 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
B29C48/405 (EP,US);
B29C48/41 (EP,US);
B29C48/57 (EP,US);
B29C48/67 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K31/7048, A61K31/7052 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2010/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT IM WESENTLICHEN NICHTKRISTALLINEN EINGEBETTETEN MAKROLID-ANTIBIOTIKA | [2010/17] | English: | PREPARATION OF COMPOSITIONS WITH ESSENTIALLY NONCRYSTALLINE EMBEDDED MACROLIDE ANTIBIOTICS | [2010/17] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS AVEC DES ANTIBIOTIQUES MACROLIDES INCORPORÉS ESSENTIELLEMENT NON CRISTALLINS | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 26.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2008 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | GB | 14.08.2017 | IE | 14.08.2017 | IT | 14.08.2017 | LU | 14.08.2017 | MT | 14.08.2017 | ES | 15.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | FR | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.08.2008 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 14.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
IT | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
MT | 14.08.2017 | ||
ES | 15.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 14.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
IT | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
MT | 14.08.2017 | ||
ES | 15.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 14.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
IT | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
MT | 14.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 14.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
IT | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 14.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
GB | 14.08.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.08.2017 | ||
LU | 14.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003091627 (SHARMA VINAY [US]) [X] 1-11,14-20 * example ** claims 1-6 * |