EP2190684 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO AMPHIBIANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gibbs Technologies Ltd. Avenue Road Nuneaton Warwickshire CV11 4LY / GB | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBBS, Alan, Timothy 28 Albert Bridge House 127 Albert Bridge Road London SW11 4PL / GB | [2014/46] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
GIBBS, Alan, Timothy 28 Albert Bridge House 127 Albert Bridge Road London SW11 4PL / GB | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Hicks, Paul Edward Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08788445.8 | 22.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008GB02886 | Priority number, date | GB20070016618 | 24.08.2007 Original published format: GB 0716618 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009027661 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190684 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2190684 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60F3/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B60F3/003 (EP,GB,US);
B60F3/0007 (CN);
B60F3/0015 (EP,US);
B60F3/0061 (US);
B60F3/0069 (EP,US);
B60F2301/00 (CN);
B60F2301/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER HINSICHTLICH VON AMPHIBIENFAHRZEUGEN | [2014/44] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO AMPHIBIANS | [2010/22] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES AMPHIBIES | [2010/22] |
Former [2010/22] | VERBESSERUNGEN VON AMPHIBIENFAHRZEUGEN ODER DIESE BETREFFEND | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 10.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13189427.1 Application refused : 19.04.2014 | EP14185902.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 24.10.2014 | EP16181333.2 / EP3138705 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2008 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | IE | 22.08.2017 | LU | 22.08.2017 | MT | 22.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.08.2008 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
MT | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 22.08.2017 | ||
LU | 22.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0341009 (ROYLE DAVID A C) [Y] 6,7 * column 3, lines 6-32; figures 5,6 *; | [XY]US5531179 (ROYCROFT TERENCE J [NZ], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,16 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - column 6, line 11 * [Y] 6,7,12-15,17-26; | [Y]US5755173 (RORABAUGH DALE [US], et al) [Y] 17-26 * abstract * * column 9, lines 14-21 * * column 10, lines 22-32 * * column 16, lines 44-67 *; | [XY]WO0244006 (GIBBS INT TECH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,16 * abstract * * page 4, lines 14-20 * [Y] 6,7,12-15,17-26; | [XY]GB2400822 (GIBBS TECH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,8-11,16 * page 3, lines 16-23; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,7,12-15,17-26; | [Y]US2006234567 (LONGDILL SIMON J [NZ], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0078] - [0083]; figures 4-7 *; | [PX]WO2008023191 (GIBBS TECH LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-26* pages 34-46; figures 38-42B * |