EP2158028 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING BY PRODUCING SHEAR AND CAVITATION IN A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/09] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING OF FLUIDS BY PRODUCING SHEAR AND/OR CAVITATION, AND COMPONENTS FOR SUCH AN APPARATUS | ||
[2012/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRISON, Lowen, Robert, Jr. 7960 Jasmine Traili Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 02 /
QUAN, Ke-ming 8647 Eagle Ridge Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
NUNES, Raul, Victorino 173 Shoemaker Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 04 /
SHANOV, Vesselin, Nikolov 2638 Fleetwood Cincinnati, Ohio 45211 / US | 05 /
CIMILUCA, Paul, Alfred 8410 Chesney Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45249 / US | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2010/09] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 08789163.6 | 27.06.2008 | [2010/09] | WO2008IB52603 | Priority number, date | US20070937501P | 28.06.2007 Original published format: US 937501 P | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009001323 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158028 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2158028 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B01F3/12, B01F5/06, B01F11/02, A61K31/60, A61K33/24 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
B01F25/40 (KR);
B01F25/45 (EP,US);
A61K33/245 (EP,US);
B01F23/20 (KR);
B01F23/238 (EP,US);
B01F23/40 (KR);
B01F23/4111 (EP,US);
B01F23/551 (EP,US);
B01F25/4521 (EP,US);
B01F31/81 (EP,US);
B01F2215/0431 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/245, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/09] | B01F5/06, B01J19/00, B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B01F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN DURCH ERZEUGEN VON SCHERUNG UND KAVITATION IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2012/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING BY PRODUCING SHEAR AND CAVITATION IN A LIQUID | [2012/14] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MÉLANGE PAR GENERATION DE CISAILLEMENT ET DE CAVITATION DANS UN LIQUIDE | [2012/14] |
Former [2010/09] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MISCHUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN DURCH ERZEUGUNG VON SCHERUNGEN ODER HOHLRÄUMEN UND KOMPONENTEN FÜR EINE SOLCHE FLÜSSIGKEIT | ||
Former [2010/09] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING OF FLUIDS BY PRODUCING SHEAR AND/OR CAVITATION, AND COMPONENTS FOR SUCH AN APPARATUS | ||
Former [2010/09] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À MÉLANGER EN PRODUISANT UN CISAILLEMENT ET/OU UNE CAVITATION ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'APPAREIL | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11178631.5 / EP2389999 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.07.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2008 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | HR | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | NO | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 27.06.2013 | LU | 27.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 27.06.2008 | |
AT | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
LU | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
NO | 14.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9944413 (FOSS ELECTRIC AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-23,33-37 * page 2, paragraphs 1-3,6 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph L * * page 5, paragraphs 1-4 * * abstract *; | [X]US2006109738 (BUCHHOLZ MARKO [DE]) [X] 1-23,33-37 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0010] - [0015] , [0033] , [0035] , [0038] * * claims 1,18,19 * * abstract *; | [X]US6331314 (KLINKSIEK BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1-23,33-37 * column 1, lines 10-15 * * column 2, lines 33-42 * * column 4, lines 8-23 * * abstract *; | [A]US4127332 (THIRUVENGADAM ALAGU P, et al) [A] 1-23,33-37 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 22 * * column 6, line 39 - column 9, line 11 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1222957 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-23,33-37 * abstract * | by applicant | US3399031 | US4675194 | US5026167 | US5837272 | WO9944413 | US2006109738 |