EP2170237 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMONS, John, Lee 7379 Dust Commander Court Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US | 02 /
FUCHS, Sybille Niddagaustrausse 75 60489 Frankfurt Hessen / DE | 03 /
HOYING, Jody, Lynn 3958 Spring Mill Way Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US | 04 /
MULLANE, Timothy, Ian 10806 North Drive Union, Kentucky 41091 / US | 05 /
WALSH, Casandre, Maffet 5651 Regimental Place Cincinnati, Ohio 45239 / US | 06 /
SAWIN, Philip, Andrew 40 Jewett Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US | 07 /
CAUDILL, Donna, Marie 7165 Juniperview Lane Madeira, Ohio 45243 / US | 08 /
NELSON, Naomi, Ruth 1623 Pullan Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45223 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 08789284.0 | 11.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008IB52808 | Priority number, date | US20070880931 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: US 880931 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009013660 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2170237 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/84, A61F13/511, A61F13/512, A61F13/513 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
A61F13/51305 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/512 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/5126 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/8405 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/511 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | A61F13/511, A61F13/512, A61F13/513 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL | [2010/14] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2010/14] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 24.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4747991 (BISHOP DELMAR J [US]) [A] 6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9740793 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE], et al) [A] 6* page 18, lines 10-31 *; | [A]US2003125687 (GUBERNICK DAVID [US], et al) [A] 6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2004102750 (JAMESON LEE K [US]) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0088] *; | [A]US2005137544 (SCHROEDER ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0077] - [0081]; figures 8-11 *; | [A]WO2006009996 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 6 * page 21, paragraph 3 * | Examination | US4673403 | US5714107 | WO0124748 | US2003114812 | GB2390546 | US2004030315 | US2004127875 | WO2004080358 | JP2005278885 | US2006129114 | US2006184150 |