EP2178908 - PEPTIDES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CONNECTIVE TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metamorefix 12a Hamada Street 76703 Rehovot / IL | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHAN, Mazal POB 1722 76804 Mazkeret Batia / IL | 02 /
GORODETSKY, Raphael 32 Hakfir Street 96952 Jerusalem / IL | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Tara Romaine FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Jennings, Tara Romaine FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Jennings, Tara Romaine FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08789795.5 | 14.08.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008IL01121 | Priority number, date | US20070935490P | 15.08.2007 Original published format: US 935490 P | US20080006501P | 16.01.2008 Original published format: US 6501 P | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009022340 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178908 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178908 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K47/48, A61K38/17 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/4726 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | PEPTIDE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BINDEGEWEBE | [2010/17] | English: | PEPTIDES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CONNECTIVE TISSUE | [2010/17] | French: | PEPTIDES ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DU TISSU CONJONCTIF | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2008 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | IE | 14.08.2013 | LU | 14.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0153324 (HADASIT MED RES SERVICE [IL], et al) [A] * claims 1-22,29,30; sequence 12 *; | [X]WO03076578 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * page 72 - page 76; claims 1-8; table A; sequences 84,86 *; | [X]US2005282747 (CLARK RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-18,20-22 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0082] - [0092]; figure 5; claims 1-29 *; | [A] - NCBI, Database accession no. AAB50706, XP002507812 [A] * column A * | [A] - NCBI, Database accession no. AAD00019, XP002507813 [A] * column A * | [A] - HARUMIYA S ET AL., "Characterization of Ficolins as Novel Elastin-Binding Proteins and Molecular Cloning of Human Ficolin-1", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 120, pages 745 - 751, XP002507811 [A] * abstract * |