EP2242394 - CONTAINER FOR PERFUMES, DEODORANTS, CREAMS, FOAMS AND GELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/43] | CONTAINER FOR FLUID PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR PERFUMES, DEODORANTS, CREAMS AND SIMILAR | ||
[2016/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stefanelli, Paolo Via Sismondi 6 20133 Milano / IT | [2017/10] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Stefanelli, Paolo Via Sismondi 6 20133 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2017/10] |
Former [2012/19] | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio, et al BUGNION S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/43] | Baroni, Matteo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08790018.9 | 25.06.2008 | [2010/43] | WO2008IT00429 | Priority number, date | WO2008IT00045 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: PCT/IT2008/000045 | [2010/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095943 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242394 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242394 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, B05B11/00, B65D83/14, G06K19/077, A47J31/46, A45D34/00, G08B13/24, B65D75/58, G09F3/00, G09F3/03, B67D7/34, G06K7/10, H04B5/00 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A45D34/00 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,US);
B67D7/348 (US);
G08B13/2445 (EP,US);
A45D2200/057 (EP,US);
B65D2203/10 (EP,US);
B65D2401/00 (EP,US);
B65D2401/05 (EP,US);
B65D75/5805 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (US);
G06K19/0776 (EP,US);
G06K19/07798 (EP,US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G09F3/0292 (EP,US);
G09F3/0335 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | A45D34/04, B05B11/00, B65D83/14, G06K19/077 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR PARFUMS, DEODORANTS, CREMES, SCHÄUME UND GELS | [2016/38] | English: | CONTAINER FOR PERFUMES, DEODORANTS, CREAMS, FOAMS AND GELS | [2016/38] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR PARFUMS, DÉODORANTS, CRÈMES, MOUSSES ET GELS | [2016/38] |
Former [2010/43] | BEHÄLTER FÜR FLUIDPRODUKTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR PARFUMS, DEODORANTS, CREMES U. Ä. | ||
Former [2010/43] | CONTAINER FOR FLUID PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR PERFUMES, DEODORANTS, CREAMS AND SIMILAR | ||
Former [2010/43] | RÉCIPIENT POUR PRODUITS FLUIDES, EN PARTICULIER PARFUMS, DÉODORANTS, CRÈMES ET PRODUITS SIMILAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 25.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2008 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IE | 25.06.2017 | LU | 25.06.2017 | MT | 25.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.06.2008 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
MT | 25.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.06.2008 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
MT | 25.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
MT | 25.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IE | 25.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 25.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1837798 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 9,10* paragraph [0007] *; | [Y]US2006001525 (NITZAN ZVI [IL], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0117] *; | [Y]DE102004040831 (POLYIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0037] *; | [XY]FR2876200 (VALOIS SA SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-8,13 * page 5, line 21 - page 10, line 27 * [Y] 9,10; | [XY]WO2006131545 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * pages 4-6 * [Y] 9,10; | [XY]US2006289679 (JOHNSON KAJ A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12,13 * paragraphs [0061] - [0064] - [0096] - [0109] * [Y] 9,10 | Examination | WO2006097760 | US2007008140 | WO2008124226 | by applicant | FR2876200 | WO2006097760 | WO2006131545 | US2006289679 | US2007008140 |