EP2306732 - IMAGE COMPRESSION DEVICE AND IMAGE RESTORATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODAGIRI, Junichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/14] | Holz, Ulrike Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08790093.2 | 27.06.2008 | [2011/14] | WO2008JP01694 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009157047 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306732 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/32 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/134 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | BILDKOMPRIMIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND BILDRESTAURATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2011/14] | English: | IMAGE COMPRESSION DEVICE AND IMAGE RESTORATION DEVICE | [2011/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION D'IMAGES ET DISPOSITIF DE RESTAURATION D'IMAGES | [2011/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2010 | Translation filed | 19.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 22.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH1020893 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH09200774 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6233355 (KAJIWARA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 18 - line 32; figure - * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 37 *; | [AD]EP0827342 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2006340134 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001024524 (SO IKKEN [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020]; figure - *; | [A]US2006133481 (CHUJOH TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * claims 1,5 * | International search | [A]JPH10336682 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH09200774 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2006340134 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) | by applicant | JP3228943B | JPH08298465 | US4093962 | JPH1020893 | JP2007001135 |