EP2180381 - FILM WITH HOLOGRAM PATTERN AND CONTAINER WITH HOLOGRAM PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8522 / JP | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIMOTO, Munekazu c/o Technology&Packaging Development Division 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
HIRATA, Katsuyuki c/o Technology&Packaging Development Division 1-70 Yako 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 08790224.3 | 18.07.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008JP01922 | Priority number, date | JP20070190239 | 20.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007190239 | [2010/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013883 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180381 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/18, B65D25/20, // G03H1/02 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G03H1/02 (EP,US);
G03H1/0256 (EP,US);
B65D2203/00 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H2250/12 (EP,US);
G03H2250/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | G03H1/18, B65D25/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | FILM MIT HOLOGRAMMMUSTER UND BEHÄLTER MIT HOLOGRAMMMUSTER | [2010/17] | English: | FILM WITH HOLOGRAM PATTERN AND CONTAINER WITH HOLOGRAM PATTERN | [2010/17] | French: | FILM AVEC UN MOTIF D'HOLOGRAMME ET CONTENANT AVEC UN MOTIF D'HOLOGRAMME | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | Translation filed | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 08.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0201323 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-13,15,17,18 * abstract * * page 7, line 27 - line 29 * * page 12, line 1 - line 32 * * page 15, line 10 - line 26 * * page 19, line 3 - line 8 * * page 25, line 10 - line 26 * * page 37, line 27 - line 32; figures 13,15 * * page 38, line 17 - line 27 * * page 39 * [I] 5,6,14,16; | [A]US2006181077 (KAULE WITTICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2007148074 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006154958 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005316212 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006248221 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH11268746 | JP2000128176 |