EP2172507 - POLYETHER POLYCARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Yoshihiko c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
OHARA, Shuichiro c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
OHGA, Masato c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Genichi c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2013/47] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
WATANABE, Yoshihiko c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | ||
02 /
OHARA, Shuichiro c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | |||
03 /
OHGA, Masato c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAMURA, Genichi c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2-1-3 Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08791581.5 | 17.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008JP63330 | Priority number, date | JP20070187792 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007187792 | [2010/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009011455 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172507 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2172507 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/02, C09J169/00, C08G64/30, C09J7/02 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
C09J169/00 (EP,US);
C08G64/0208 (EP,US);
C08G64/305 (EP,US);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
C09J2469/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | C08G64/02, C09J169/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | POLYETHER-POLYCARBONAT | [2010/14] | English: | POLYETHER POLYCARBONATE | [2010/14] | French: | POLYÉTHER POLYCARBONATE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2010 | Translation filed | 18.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2008 | AT | 20.11.2013 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | CZ | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | ES | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | HR | 20.11.2013 | IT | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | PL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | NO | 20.02.2014 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | IE | 17.07.2014 | LU | 17.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.07.2008 | |
AT | 20.11.2013 | ||
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
GR | 21.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
PL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 20.11.2013 | |
ES | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | |
NO | 20.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4833036 (CANNARSA MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-13* examples IIIB, IIIC; claim 1 *; | [XI]EP0335416 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-10 * page 14, line 3 - page 14, line 4; examples 3, 7; claims 1-4 * [I] 11; | [XI]EP0798328 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3-10 * page 6, line 51 - page 8, line 55; example 8; claims 1, 4, 12 * [I] 11; | [X]EP1134248 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003]; claims 1 a, 2, 3 * | International search | [XA]JPS5986639 (BAYER AG) [X] 1, 2, 6-8 * , Claims; examples 1 to 4, 7 to 9 & US 4506045 A & EP 105399 A1 & DE 3236521 A *[A] 3-5, 9-13; | [XA]JPH048725 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-8, 13 * , Claims; examples 1 to 4 & US 5387354 A & EP 421298 A2 & DE 69031966 C & BR 9004888 A & CA 2026504 A & DD 298261 A & RU 2070192 C & AT 162536 T & AU 628659 B & CZ 279995 B & NZ 235355 A & KR 10-1993-0004162 B & CN 1105057 A * [A] 9-12; | [XA]JPH05279468 (Takemoto Oil & Fat Co., Ltd.) [X] 1-8 * , Claims; examples 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [A] 9-13; | [XA]JPH06508383 (Mediolanum Farmaceutici S.p.A.) [X] 1-8 * , Claims; examples 1 to 32 & US 5463012 A & EP 588853 A & WO 1992/022600 A1 & DE 69213937 T & IT 1248061 B & GR 3021602 T & ES 2092116 T & DK 588853 T & AT 143030 T & AU 1910892 A * [A] 9-13; | [XA]JPH09508674 (Henkel KGaA) [X] 1-4, 6-8 * , Claims; examples 1 to 8 & US 5683612 A & EP 743992 A & WO 1995/021956 A1 & DE 4404176 A & ES 2112045 T * [A] 5, 9-13; | [XA]JPH1045678 (ENICHEM SPA) [X] 1-11, 13 * , Claims; examples 1 to 12 & US 5795952 A & EP 798327 A3 & IT 96500615 A * [A] 12; | [XA]JP2005232447 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-8, 13 * , Claims; examples 1, 4 & US 2007/0155933 A1 & EP 1707586 A1 & WO 2005/070997 A1 * [A] 9-12; | [PX]JP2008024849 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [PX] 1, 2, 9-11 * , Claims; Par. No. [0044] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS5496539 | JPS5626968 | JPH09235537 |