EP2177663 - SLOW-BURN-EXTENSION CIGARETTE WRAPPING PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMINAMI, Takashi c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2014/18] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
KOMINAMI, Takashi c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08791987.4 | 31.07.2008 | [2010/16] | WO2008JP63772 | Priority number, date | JP20070209036 | 10.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007209036 | [2010/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009022545 | Date: | 19.02.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2177663 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2177663 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/00, A24D1/02 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
A24D1/02 (KR);
A24D1/025 (EP,US);
D21H1/00 (KR);
D21H19/22 (EP,US);
D21H17/36 (EP,US);
D21H19/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/16] | D21H27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | ZIGARETTENDREHPAPIER MIT LANGSAM ABBRENNENDER ERWEITERUNG | [2010/16] | English: | SLOW-BURN-EXTENSION CIGARETTE WRAPPING PAPER | [2010/16] | French: | PAPIER À ROULER LES CIGARETTES À EXTENSION DE COMBUSTION LENTE | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2010 | Translation filed | 12.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2008 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | HR | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | NO | 30.07.2014 | LU | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006098153 ; | [Y]US2006021625 (NYFFELER URS [CH]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1,14 *; | [Y]WO03061410 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1,2,3,8 * * page 11, line 11 - line 13 * * figure 2 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 69, Database accession no. 2006-669804, XP002682505 & WO2006098153 A1 20060921 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [XY]JP2005514939 (Schweitzer-Mauduit International, Inc.) [X] 2 * , Claims; Par. No. [0042]; Fig. 2 & US 2003/0136420 A1 & EP 1482815 A1 & WO 2003/061410 A1 * [Y] 1, 3-6; | [Y]WO2006098153 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , Par. No. [0013] & US 2008/0011312 A1 & EP 1867782 A1 *; | [Y]WO0217737 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * , Fig. 1 & US 2003/0150466 A1 & EP 1321048 A1 * | by applicant | JP2004512849 |