EP2190765 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Essity Hygiene and Health AB SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Sca Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HJALMARSSON, Lennart Längdhoppsvägen 3 S-517 35 Bollebyggd / SE | 02 /
TÖRNQVIST, Sophia Särö Skansenvägen 3 S-429 41 Säro / SE | 03 /
BELIN, Anders Kvadrantgatan 64 SE-415 16 Göteborg / SE | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
HJALMARSSON, Lennart Trappvägen 1 S-517 37 Bollebyggd / SE | ||
02 /
TÖRNQVIST, Sophia Särö Skansenvägen 3 S-429 41 Säro / SE | |||
03 /
BELIN, Anders Hagäkersgatan 4C S-431 41 Mölndal / SE | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/22] | Ekwall, Peter Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08794106.8 | 28.08.2008 | [2010/22] | WO2008SE00480 | Priority number, date | GB20070016782 | 29.08.2007 Original published format: GB 0716782 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009029017 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190765 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2190765 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/032, B65H39/14, B65H39/16, B32B37/00, B32B37/22, B32B38/18 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
B65H39/16 (EP,US);
A61F13/15772 (GB);
B32B37/0046 (EP,US);
B32B38/1833 (GB);
B32B38/1841 (EP,US);
B65H19/1852 (GB);
B65H23/032 (EP,GB,US);
B65H39/14 (EP,US);
G06T7/0004 (GB);
G06V10/245 (GB);
B32B2309/72 (EP,US);
B32B2555/02 (EP,US);
B32B37/223 (EP,US);
B65H2511/413 (EP);
B65H2511/512 (EP,US);
B65H2553/42 (EP,US);
B65H2557/24 (EP);
B65H2801/57 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/512, B65H2220/03, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | B65H23/032, B32B37/16, B32B38/18, B65H39/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER BAHN | [2010/22] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A WEB | [2010/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTRÔLER UNE BANDE | [2010/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21] | Request for further processing for: | 18.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2008 | AT | 13.06.2018 | CY | 13.06.2018 | CZ | 13.06.2018 | DK | 13.06.2018 | EE | 13.06.2018 | ES | 13.06.2018 | FI | 13.06.2018 | HR | 13.06.2018 | LT | 13.06.2018 | LV | 13.06.2018 | MC | 13.06.2018 | NL | 13.06.2018 | PL | 13.06.2018 | PT | 13.06.2018 | RO | 13.06.2018 | SE | 13.06.2018 | SI | 13.06.2018 | SK | 13.06.2018 | TR | 13.06.2018 | IE | 28.08.2018 | LU | 28.08.2018 | MT | 28.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | BG | 13.09.2018 | GB | 13.09.2018 | NO | 13.09.2018 | GR | 14.09.2018 | IS | 13.10.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.08.2008 | |
AT | 13.06.2018 | ||
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PT | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GB | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
TR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GB | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
MT | 28.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GB | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
GB | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
DK | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SI | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
LU | 28.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
MC | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 13.06.2018 | |
CY | 13.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2018 | ||
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
PL | 13.06.2018 | ||
RO | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
SK | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
EE | 13.06.2018 | ||
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
IS | 13.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
NL | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
GR | 14.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
LV | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
HR | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 13.06.2018 | |
ES | 13.06.2018 | ||
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
SE | 13.06.2018 | ||
BG | 13.09.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 13.06.2018 | |
FI | 13.06.2018 | ||
LT | 13.06.2018 | ||
NO | 13.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0260498 (COORS CO ADOLPH [US]); | [AD]US2004028268 (POPP ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]JP2006282372 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2007169009 (KAO CORP) | International search | [X]US5942077 (TANG LUEN SING [HK]); | [A]US2003051802 (HARGETT MARK MASON [US], et al); | [A]US6732778 (MACHIDA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al); | [A]US2005056678 (NOMURA HIRONORI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006196594 (SHIMIZU MASARU [JP], et al) |