EP2257322 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VASCULAR ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, David 10175 Danube Dr. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08795077.0 | 05.08.2008 | [2010/49] | WO2008US09450 | Priority number, date | US20080072683 | 16.05.2008 Original published format: US 72683 | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/49] | US20080072683 | 26.02.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009108164 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257322 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/178 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61M1/3653 (EP);
A61M1/3655 (EP);
A61M1/3661 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00778 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR GEFÄSSZUGANG | [2010/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VASCULAR ACCESS | [2010/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D ACCÈS VASCULAIRE | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 18.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2011 | 31.08.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4368736 (KASTER ROBERT L [US]); | [Y]US4921478 (SOLANO SCOTT J [US], et al); | [Y]US5383897 (WHOLEY MARK H [US]); | [Y]US5383899 (HAMMERSLAG JULIUS G [US]); | [Y]US5810884 (KIM DUCKSOO [US]); | [Y]US5858002 (JESCH FRANZ [DE]); | [Y]US6165209 (PATTERSON GREG R [US], et al); | [Y]US2003060716 (HEIDRICH JENS PETER [DE]); | [Y]US2003088153 (CARRILLO OSCAR R [US], et al); | [Y]US6726923 (IYER SRIRAM S [US], et al); | [Y]US2005004594 (NOOL JEFFREY [US], et al); | [Y]US2005154344 (CHANG DAVID W [US]); | [Y]US7022131 (DEROWE ARI [IL], et al); | [X]US7060084 (LOSHAKOVE AMIR [IL], et al); | [Y]US2006173379 (RASCH-MENGES JURGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2007030817 (ARUNACHALAM SENTHIL [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007079408 (BARD INC C R [US], et al); | [Y]US2007167901 (HERRIG JUDSON A [US], et al); | [X]US2007197896 (MOLL FREDERIC H [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007146243 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US], et al) |