EP2183268 - METHODS FOR PURIFICATION OF ALPHA-1-ANTITRYPSIN AND APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINKMAN, Nathan 429 N. Mulberry Street St. Herscher, IL 60941 / US | 02 /
BIGLER, Douglas 456 S. Yates Avenue Kankakee, IL 60901 / US | 03 /
BOLLI, Reinhard Bellevuestrasse 14 3073 Gümligen / CH | 04 /
FOERTSCH, Vreni Birkenweg 8 CH-4652 Winznau / CH | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
BRINKMAN, Nathan 429 N. Mulberry Street St. Herscher, IL 60941 / US | ||
02 /
BIGLER, Douglas 456 S. Yates Avenue Kankakee, IL 60901 / US | |||
03 /
BOLLI, Reinhard Niesenstr. 7 CH-3076 Worb / CH | |||
04 /
FOERTSCH, Vreni Birkenweg 8 CH-4652 Winznau / CH | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2010/19] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08795338.6 | 15.08.2008 | [2010/19] | WO2008US09745 | Priority number, date | US20070935527P | 17.08.2007 Original published format: US 935527 P | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009025754 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2183268 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2183268 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/14, C07K1/16, C07K1/30, C07K1/36, C07K14/775, C07K14/81 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/775 (EP,US);
C07K1/36 (US);
C07K14/8125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON ALPHA-1-ANTITRYPSIN UND APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I | [2010/19] | English: | METHODS FOR PURIFICATION OF ALPHA-1-ANTITRYPSIN AND APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I | [2010/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION D'ALPHA-1-ANTITRYPSINE ET D'APOLIPOPROTÉINE A-I | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12172445.4 / EP2520583 | EP12172446.2 / EP2522674 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.08.2008 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | HR | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MC | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | NO | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 10.10.2012 | |
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 10.10.2012 | |
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0017227 (AMERICAN NAT RED CROSS [US]) [X] 1-15,19-25 * abstract * * page 16, line 8 - line 22 * [Y] 16-18; | [Y]US2004124143 (KEE SCOTT M [US], et al) [Y] 14-18 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2006023831 (PROMETIC BIOSCIENCES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-13,19-25 * example 1; claims 1,2,6,10; table 2 * [Y] 14-18; | [A]WO2007062270 (PROTEOMTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 18-21 * paragraphs [0033] , [0113]; claim 30 *; | [XY]WO2007063129 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-13,19-25 * page 65, line 1 - page 66, line 30; example 1 * [Y] 14-18; | [DA] - PEITSCH M C ET AL, "A PURIFICATION METHOD FOR APOLIPOPROTEIN A-I AND A-II", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. NEW YORK, (19890101), vol. 178, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 301 - 305, XP009023396 [DA] 1-25 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(89)90642-8 | [A] - CHEN S X ET AL, "Chromatographic purification of human alpha1 proteinase inhibitor from dissolved Cohn fraction IV-1 paste", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980327), vol. 800, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 207 - 218, XP004113596 [A] 1-25 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(97)01119-9 | [DA] - COHN E J ET AL, "A system for the separation of the components of human blood: Quantitative procedures for the separation of the protein components of human plasma", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 1950, (1950), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 465 - 474, XP002499900 [DA] 1-25 * tables III-V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01157a122 | [Y] - GLASER C B ET AL, "The isolation of alpha-1-protease inhibitor by a unique procedure designed for industrial application", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. NEW YORK, vol. 124, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, (19820801), pages 364 - 371, (19820801), XP024825556 [Y] 14-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(82)90053-7 | [Y] - AGNESE S T ET AL, "Evaluation of four reagents for delipidation of serum", CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER INC, US, CA, vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0009-9120, (19830401), pages 98 - 100, (19830401), XP023599939 [Y] 14-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9120(83)90676-8 | [A] - VALLANCE D T ET AL, "Precipitation procedures used to isolate high density lipoprotein with particular reference to effects on apo A-I-only particles and lipoprotein(a)", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 229, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-8981, (19940901), pages 77 - 85, (19940901), XP025201141 [A] 14-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(94)90230-5 | [A] - FETZ KATHRIN ET AL, "Purification and partial characterization of feline alpha1-proteinase inhibitor (falpha1-PI) and the development and validation of a radioimmunoassay for the measurement of falpha1-PI in serum.", BIOCHIMIE (PARIS), (200401), vol. 86, no. 1, ISSN 0300-9084, pages 67 - 75, XP002514306 [A] 18-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biochi.2003.10.005 | [A] - OLAH S ET AL, "Hydrophobic interaction chromatography of human serum alpha1-antitrypsin and alpha1-acid glycoprotein", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B : BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20000707), vol. 744, no. 1, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 73 - 79, XP004222468 [A] 18-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00232-2 | [A] - RAYNES J G ET AL, "Purification of serum amyloid a and other high density apolipoproteins by hydrophobic interaction chromatography", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. NEW YORK, vol. 173, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, (19880815), pages 116 - 124, (19880815), XP024829904 [A] 18-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(88)90168-6 |