EP2120842 - HYBRID ORGANIC/INORGANIC CHEMICAL HYBRID SYSTEMS, INCLUDING FUNCTIONALIZED CALCIUM PHOSPHATE HYBRID SYSTEMS, AND A SOLID-STATE METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana Nanotech Division of Therametric Technologies, INC. 351 West 10th Street, Suite 222 Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLINSEY, Robert, L. 412 N. New Jersey Street, Apt. C IN 46204, Indianapolis / US | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2019/34] |
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08795787.4 | 23.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US51795 | Priority number, date | US20070888354P | 06.02.2007 Original published format: US 888354 P | US20070891849P | 27.02.2007 Original published format: US 891849 P | US20070941095P | 31.05.2007 Original published format: US 941095 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008137190 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120842 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120842 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/21 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61K8/21 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C01B25/32 (EP,US);
A61K6/74 (US);
A61K9/1611 (US);
A61K9/1617 (US);
B23C2220/00 (US);
C01F11/00 (US);
C08K2003/325 (US);
Y10T409/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | A61K6/08, A61Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE/ANORGANISCHE CHEMISCHE HYBRIDSYSTEME EINSCHLIESSLICH FUNKTIONALISIERTER CALCIUMPHOSPHAT-HYBRIDSYSTEME UND FESTKÖRPERVERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/48] | English: | HYBRID ORGANIC/INORGANIC CHEMICAL HYBRID SYSTEMS, INCLUDING FUNCTIONALIZED CALCIUM PHOSPHATE HYBRID SYSTEMS, AND A SOLID-STATE METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [2009/48] | French: | SYSTÈMES HYBRIDES ORGANIQUES/INORGANIQUES, COMPRENANT DES SYSTÈMES HYBRIDES DE PHOSPHATE DE CALCIUM FONCTIONNALISÉ, ET UN PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE DE TELS SYSTÈMES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 27.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2008 | AT | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | IT | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | LU | 23.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/51] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6126097 (CHEN SHIZHU [CN], et al) [A] 2-6,9 * claim - *; | [X]US2003120351 (TOFIGHI ALIASSGHAR [US], et al) [X] 6 * page 1, paragraphs [0011],[0013] * * page 2, paragraph [0031] * * page 3, paragraph [0032] - page 4, paragraph [0040] * * page 6, paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] *; | [X]US2003124066 (DIXON CLOYD [US], et al) [X] 9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * page 2, paragraph [0026] * * page 3, paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * page 6, paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0084]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2004126335 (FALLER ROBERT VINCENT [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,9 * page 1, paragraphs [0001], [0005] ** page 2, paragraph [0008]; claim - *; | [X] - KIM S B ET AL, "Bioactive organic-inorganic composite prepared by mechanochemical method", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS, TRANS TECH PUBLICATIONS LTD., STAFA-ZURICH, CH, (20020101), vol. 218-220, no. Bioceramics-14, ISSN 1013-9826, pages 295 - 298, XP009127712 [X] 6 * page 296 * | [XY] - A.V.Dushkin, "Potential of Mechanochemical Technology in Organic Synthesis and Synthesis of New Materials", Chemistry for Sustainable Development, vol. 12, (2004), pages 251 - 273, Institute of Solid State Chemistry and Mechanochemistry, Siberian Branch of the Russian Academy of Sciences, UI. (Russia), URL: http://www.sibran.ru/upload/iblock/4a3/4a30bb11b1f14f9ba59ef882d00ac034.pdf, (20140821), XP002728802 [X] 6 * page 261, paragraph 4.2 * * page 265, paragraph 6.1 - page 266, paragraph 6.2 * * page 269, paragraph 7 * [Y] 2-5,9 | International search | [Y]US4877603 (DEGENHARDT CHARLES R [US], et al); | [X]US2002037258 (DODD GREGORY P [US], et al) | by applicant | US4877603 | US2002037258 | US2003120351 | US2003124066 | - A. V. DUSHKIN, "Potential of Mechanochemical Technology in Organic Synthesis and Synthesis of New Materials", Chemistry for Sustainable Development, (20040000), vol. 12, pages 251 - 273 | - S. B. KIMS. B CHOK. J. CHOY. J. KIMH. S. JEONT. H. LEEY. HWANG, "Bioactive Organic-Inorganic Composite Prepared by Mechanochemical Method", Key Engineering Materials, (20020000), vol. 218-220, pages 295 - 298, XP009127712 |