EP2170137 - FOLDING LEG SYSTEM FOR A COOKING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunbeam Products, Inc. 2381 Executive Center Drive Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENBERG, Joshua 719 Savannah Avenue Floor 2 Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | 02 /
SEAGER, Nicholas 6503 N. Military Trail 3704 Boca Raton, FL 33496 / US | 03 /
RATSIMOR, Anatoly 4 Kilsyth Terrace Brighton, MA 02135 / US | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
GREENBERG, Joshua 719 Savannah Avenue Floor 2 Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | ||
02 /
SEAGER, Nicholas 4889 South Citation Way 203 Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | |||
03 /
RATSIMOR, Anatoly 4 Kilsyth Terrace Brighton, MA 02135 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius, Corinna, et al Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Widenmayerstrasse 43 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Cramphorn, Conrad, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent-und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08796557.0 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US71039 | Priority number, date | US20070880719 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: US 880719 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009015280 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2170137 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A47J37/0676 (EP,US);
A47J2037/0777 (EP,US);
A47J2043/0738 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPBEINSYSTEM FÜR EINE KOCHVORRICHTUNG | [2010/14] | English: | FOLDING LEG SYSTEM FOR A COOKING APPLIANCE | [2010/14] | French: | SYSTÈME À PATTES PLIABLES POUR APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 22.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6863063 (YEH JUI-JU [TW]); | [A]US2006065665 (SWARTFAGER BRIAN A [US], et al); | [A]US4621608 (LEE JAMES F [US]); | [A]JPH04337554 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |