EP2205932 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MEASURING INSTALLATION DIMENSIONS FOR FLOW MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATZINGER, Thomas, James 12 Kelly Meadow Road Burnt Hills NY 12027 / US | 02 /
TILDEN, Jeffrey, David 55 Burt Street Norton MA 02766 / US | 03 /
AO, Xiaolei, Shirley 60 Ivan Street Lexington MA 02420 / US | 04 /
FAIDI, Waseem, Ibrahim 12 Jester Court Schenectady NY 12304 / US | 05 /
WU, Yanyan 1500 Belmont Avenue Schenectady NJ 12308 / US | 06 /
CORBY, Nelson, Raymond, Jr. 813 Charles Street Scotia NY 12302 / US | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/28] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08796766.7 | 29.07.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008US71439 | Priority number, date | US20070923881 | 25.10.2007 Original published format: US 923881 | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009055110 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2205932 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2205932 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/00, G01F1/66, G01B5/12, G01B7/06, G01B17/02, G01B15/02 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G01B17/02 (EP,US);
G01B15/02 (EP,US);
G01B5/12 (EP,US);
G01B7/06 (EP,US);
G01F1/00 (EP,US);
G01F1/66 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/28] | G01B5/12, G01B15/02, G01B17/02, F16L55/00, G01F1/05, G01B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON INSTALLATIONSABMESSUNGEN FÜR EIN STRÖMUNGSMESSSYSTEM | [2010/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MEASURING INSTALLATION DIMENSIONS FOR FLOW MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2010/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER LES DIMENSIONS D'INSTALLATION POUR UN SYSTÈME DE MESURE D'ÉCOULEMENT | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2014 | 29.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2008 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | IT | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | GB | 29.07.2015 | IE | 29.07.2015 | LU | 29.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3732726 (FERBER F) [Y] 1-26 * column 3, line 56 - column 6, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US2004167735 (ROTHMAN PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1,8-10,17,18,25,26 * paragraphs [0009] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-7,11-16,19-24; | [YA]WO03076869 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [Y] 2-4,11-13,20-22 * abstract * [A] 1,5-10,14-19,23-26; | [YA]US2001029989 (PAZ GERMAN N [US]) [Y] 5-7,14-16,19,23,24 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006]; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 1-4,8-13,17,18,20-22,25,26; | [YA]DE4222611 (THEYSOHN FRIEDRICH FA [DE]) [Y] 18,25,26 * abstract * [A] 1-17,19-24 | Examination | US6091500 | by applicant | US3732726 | US2004167735 |